Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3503289

EP3503289 - RFID INLAY INCORPORATING A GROUND PLANE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  27.05.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019Change - classificationpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Avery Dennison Corporation
8080 Norton Parkway, Bldg. 22 D
Mentor, OH 44060 / US
[2019/26]
Inventor(s)01 / Forster, Ian James
31 Great Cob
Chelmsford
Essex / GB
 [2019/26]
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2019/26]
Application number, filing date19150354.911.03.2014
[2019/26]
Priority number, dateUS20131379855713.03.2013         Original published format: US201313798557
[2019/26]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3503289
Date:26.06.2019
Language:EN
[2019/26]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3503289
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01Q1/22, // H01Q1/38, H01Q9/40
[2019/26]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/26]
TitleGerman:RFID-INLAY MIT EINER MASSEFLÄCHE[2019/26]
English:RFID INLAY INCORPORATING A GROUND PLANE[2019/26]
French:INCRUSTATION RFID INCORPORANT UN PLAN DE MASSE[2019/26]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP14719910.3  / EP2973846
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
04.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
04.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE102006052517  (BIELOMATIK LEUZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0019] - [0025] * [I] 3,5;
 [XI]US2011279326  (DOKAI YUYA [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0041] - [0061] * [I] 3,5