Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3525487 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3525487



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 86
20.08.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
17.07.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
29.04.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
29.04.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 5
29.04.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
29.04.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
15.04.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
01.02.2019 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 3
18.01.2019 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
18.01.2019 Priority document Search / examination 37
16.01.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
16.01.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
16.01.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
16.01.2019 Description Search / examination 15
16.01.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
16.01.2019 Drawings Search / examination 4
16.01.2019 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 4