Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3525125

EP3525125 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTHENTICATING A COMPONENT IN A POWER CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.02.2020
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.02.2020The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established 
21.02.2020Request for examination filedpublished on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
21.02.2020Change - designated statespublished on 25.03.2020 [2020/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
GE Energy Power Conversion Technology Ltd.
Boughton Road, Rugby
Warwickshire CV21 1BU / GB
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / LOUCO, Lathom Alexander
c/o GE Controls & Electronics
1501 Roanoke Blvd
Salem, VA Virginia 24153 / US
02 / MICHENER, Nathaniel Robert
c/o GE Controls & Electronics
1501 Roanoke Blvd
Salem, VA Virginia 24153 / US
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)Serjeants LLP
Dock
75 Exploration Drive
Leicester, LE4 5NU / GB
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date19154185.329.01.2019
[2019/33]
Priority number, dateUS20181589383412.02.2018         Original published format: US201815893834
[2019/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3525125
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:G06F21/44, G06F21/75, G06F21/73, // G06Q30/00
[2019/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/13]
Former [2019/33]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINER KOMPONENTE IN EINEM LEISTUNGSWANDLER[2019/33]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR AUTHENTICATING A COMPONENT IN A POWER CONVERTER[2019/33]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'UN COMPOSANT DANS UN CONVERTISSEUR DE PUISSANCE[2019/33]
Examination procedure12.02.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.02.2020Examination requested  [2020/13]
13.02.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
Documents cited:Search[X]US2014358792  (BERKE STUART ALLEN [US], et al) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 31] - [0034] - [0 40] - [0046] - [0 54] - [0062] - [0 68] - [0069] - [0 74]; figures 1, 2, 5, 10 *;
 [X]US8798852  (CHEN CHING [TW], et al) [X] 1-15 * col. 1, lines 8-9, 52-67; col. 2,lines 1-9, 31-67; col. 3, lines 1-32; col. 7, lines 7-21; col. 15, lines 64-67; col. 16, lines 1-23; col. 18, lines 58-67; col. 19, lines 1-44; col. 29, lines 32-37; col. 30, lines 1-23 *;
 [I]US6032257  (OLARIG SOMPONG P [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * col. 3, lines 17-44; col. 4, lines 57-61; col. 5, line 38 - col. 6, line 20; col. 8, lines 11-67 *;
 [I]EP3166216  (GE ENERGY POWER CONVERSION TECHNOLOGY LTD [GB]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0004] , [0 20] - [0024] - [0 44] - [0047] *;
 [A]US2006052905  (PFINGSTEN THOMAS R [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0092] , [ 103] , [ 135] - [0136] - [ 140] - [0142] - [ 160] - [0161] *