Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3524234

EP3524234 - SOLID STATE FORMS OF SOFOSBUVIR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip12.07.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 14.08.2019  [2019/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ratiopharm GmbH
Graf-Arco-Strasse 3
89079 Ulm / DE
For all designated states
Teva Pharmaceuticals International GmbH
Schlüsselstrasse 12
8645 Jona / CH
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / ALBRECHT, Wolfgang
Alfred Mendlerweg 25/1
89079 Ulm / DE
02 / ARONHIME, Judith
Maor Yosef Street 5A
7621745 Rehovot / IL
03 / CHAURASIA, Brijnath, P.
E-403 Parsavnath Prestige
Sector 93A
GB Nagar
Noida Uttar Pradesh / IN
04 / GEIER, Jens
Orchideenstrasse 2
72534 Hayingen / DE
05 / GUSERLE, Richard
Sternenweg 6
89359 Koetz / DE
06 / HRAKOVSKY, Julia
4 Daya Street
48560 Rosh Ha-Ayin / IL
07 / LAUER, Claudia
Forstenrieder-Park-Strasse 19
82131 Gauting / DE
08 / PRAJAPATI, Ramkaran
House No. 1958
Ward No. 10
Village-Radaur Dist.
Yamuna Nagar
Haryana / IN
09 / KANSAL, Vinod, K.
Flat No. D5-501 The Pranayam
Sector 80-85
Greater Faridabad
Haryana / IN
10 / KUMAR, Pavan, V.
House No. 6-73/2
Sri Datta Nilayam
Srinivas Colony
Mahabub Nagar
Andhra Pradesh / IN
11 / MIKA, Hans-Juergen
Am Rehsprung 20
53229 Bonn / DE
12 / MUPPALLA, Siva, Rama Krishna
C-65 Teva Officers Colony
Bijnor Road
244235 Gajraula UP / IN
13 / RATKAJ, Marina
Pohorska 20
10000 Zagreb / HR
14 / SAFONOV, Roman
Mivtza Uvda 9/2
Rosh Haayin 4805409 / IL
15 / SCHENK, Dirk
Eckbergstr. 9
76534 Baden-Baden / DE
16 / SRIVASTAV, Naveen, C.
House No. 144
Mohalla-Shahganj
Sultanpur Uttar Pradesh / IN
17 / STEFAN, Ralph
Kirchstrasse 28
88370 Ebenweiler / DE
18 / TRIPATHI, Ashish
N-463(C) Aashiana
Colony
Lucknow Uttar Pradesh / IN
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)D Young & Co LLP
120 Holborn
London EC1N 2DY / GB
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date19154561.512.06.2015
[2019/33]
Priority number, dateIN2014DEL161013.06.2014         Original published format: IN 1610DE2014
EP2014000227903.07.2014         Original published format: EP 14002279
EP2014018027807.08.2014         Original published format: EP 14180278
IN2014DEL226808.08.2014         Original published format: IN 2268DE2014
US201562119599P23.05.2015         Original published format: US 201562119599 P
US201562157043P05.05.2015         Original published format: US 201562157043 P
EP2015016722811.05.2015         Original published format: EP 15167228
EP2015016768313.05.2015         Original published format: EP 15167683
IN2015DEL134814.05.2015         Original published format: IN 1348DE2015
EP2015016988829.05.2015         Original published format: EP 15169888
[2019/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3524234
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/20, A61K31/7072, A61P31/18, A61K31/4184
[2019/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
Validation statesMANot yet paid
TitleGerman:FESTE FORMEN VON SOFOSBUVIR[2019/33]
English:SOLID STATE FORMS OF SOFOSBUVIR[2019/33]
French:FORMES À L'ÉTAT SOLIDE DE SOFOSBUVIR[2019/33]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15733573.8  / EP3154526
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
30.01.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XD]US2011251152  (ROSS BRUCE S [US], et al) [XD] 1-13 * example - * * claim - *;
 [I]WO2011123645  (PHARMASSET INC [US], et al) [I] 1-13 * example - *;
 [I]WO2013082003  (GILEAD PHARMASSET LLC [US]) [I] 1-13 * claim - *
 [A]  - CAIRA, "Crystalline Polymorphism of Organic Compounds", TOPICS IN CURRENT CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (19980101), vol. 198, ISSN 0340-1022, pages 163 - 208, XP008166276 [A] 1-13 * page 165, paragraph l - page 166, paragraph 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/3-540-69178-2_5
by applicantWO2013082003
 WO2014120981
 US7964580
 US8334270
 WO2010135569
 US2011251152
 WO2011123645
 CN104130302
 CN104277088
 CN104447924
    - B. S. ROSS; P. G. REDDY; H.-R. ZHANG; S. RACHAKONDA; M. J. SOFIA, J. Org. Chem., (20110000), vol. 76, page 8311
    - PALATINUS L.; CHAPUIS G., J. Appl. Cryst., (20070000), vol. 40, pages 786 - 790
    - BETTERIDGE, P.W.; CARRUTHERS, J.R.; COOPER, R.I.; PROUT, K.; WATKIN, D.J., J. Appl. Cryst., (20030000), vol. 36, page 1487