Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3525289 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3525289



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 44
20.08.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
17.07.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.06.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
25.06.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 4
25.06.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
25.06.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
11.06.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
12.04.2019 Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document Search / examination 1
09.04.2019 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 10
07.02.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
07.02.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
07.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 2
07.02.2019 Description Search / examination 5
07.02.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
07.02.2019 Drawings Search / examination 4
07.02.2019 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5