EP3503450 - WIRELESS COMMUNICATION BASE STATION EQUIPMENT, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION TERMINAL DEVICE AND SEARCH SPACE SETTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 27.08.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2021 | Withdrawal of application | published on 29.09.2021 [2021/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 c/o Reiwa Accounting Holdings Co., Ltd. 13th Floor, Nihombashi itchome Building 1-4-1 Nihombashi, Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-0027 / JP | [2021/02] |
Former [2019/26] | For all designated states Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 Sakura Sogo Jimusho 1-11 Kanda Jimbocho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIO, Akihiko Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 Sakura Sogo Jimusho 1-11 Kanda-Jimbocho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | 02 /
NAKAO, Seigo Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 Sakura Sogo Jimusho 1-11 Kanda-Jimbocho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | 03 /
IMAMURA, Daichi Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 Sakura Sogo Jimusho 1-11 Kanda-Jimbocho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | 04 /
HOSHINO, Masayuki Godo Kaisha IP Bridge 1 Sakura Sogo Jimusho 1-11 Kanda-Jimbocho Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101-0051 / JP | [2019/26] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2019/26] | Application number, filing date | 19156184.4 | 30.10.2009 | [2019/26] | Priority number, date | JP20080281389 | 31.10.2008 Original published format: JP 2008281389 | [2019/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3503450 | Date: | 26.06.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.05.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L1/00, H04L5/00, H04W72/04, H04W28/04, H04W74/08 | [2019/26] | CPC: |
H04L1/1854 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L1/0046 (EP,BR,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04L1/0025 (KR,US);
H04L1/0027 (KR,US);
H04L1/0072 (EP,BR,US);
H04L1/1861 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L5/001 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L5/0042 (EP,BR,KR,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP,BR,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,BR,US);
H04L5/0092 (EP,BR,US);
H04L5/0094 (US);
H04W28/04 (US);
H04W72/0453 (KR,US);
H04W72/20 (KR,US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W72/29 (US);
H04W74/085 (EP,BR,US);
H04W88/02 (KR);
H04W88/08 (KR);
H05K999/00 (US);
H05K999/99 (US);
H04L1/0038 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/26] | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONBASISSTATIONSAUSRÜSTUNG, DRAHTLOSKOMMUNIKATIONSENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND SUCHBEREICHEINSTELLVERFAHREN | [2019/26] | English: | WIRELESS COMMUNICATION BASE STATION EQUIPMENT, WIRELESS COMMUNICATION TERMINAL DEVICE AND SEARCH SPACE SETTING METHOD | [2019/26] | French: | ÉQUIPEMENT DE STATION DE BASE DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL, DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL DE COMMUNICATION SANS FIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉGLAGE D'ESPACE DE RECHERCHE | [2019/26] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2019 | Examination requested [2019/26] | 26.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.08.2021 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2021/39] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09823347.1 / EP2352350 | EP17197389.4 / EP3297373 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA] - NOKIA ET AL, "L1 control signaling with carrier aggregation in LTE-Advanced", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-083730, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080924), no. Prague, Czech Republic; 20080924, XP050317069 [I] 12 * figures 1,2 * * section 3, first par. * * section 3.2, last par. * [A] 1-11,13 | [A] - PANASONIC, "Support of UL/DL asymmetric carrier aggregation", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-082999, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20080812), no. Jeju; 20080812, XP050316462 [A] 1-13 * section 2. Asymmetric carrier aggregation in DL and UL * * section 7: PUSCH * | by applicant | JP2008281391 |