blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3536927

EP3536927 - SUPERCHARGING DEVICE FOR ENGINE, ENGINE, METHOD OF SUPERCHARGING ENGINE, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  06.08.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  28.08.2020
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.06.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  08.11.2019
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MK
published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1 Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / MATOBA, Yasunori
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
02 / MORIOKA, Hiroyuki
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
03 / MIYACHI, Takayoshi
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi
Fuchu-cho
Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
 [2020/40]
Former [2019/37]01 / MATOBA, Yasunori
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi
Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
02 / MORIOKA, Hiroyuki
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi
Fuchu-cho, Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
03 / MIYACHI, Takayoshi
c/o Mazda Motor Corporation
3-1, Shinchi
Fuchu-cho, Aki-guni, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP
Representative(s)Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Friedenheimer Brücke 21
80639 München / DE
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date19156362.611.02.2019
[2019/37]
Priority number, dateJP2018004040707.03.2018         Original published format: JP 2018040407
[2019/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536927
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3536927
Date:30.09.2020
Language:EN
[2020/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.06.2019
ClassificationIPC:F02B33/38, F02B39/12, F04D25/02, F02D23/00, F02D41/00, // F02D41/06, F02B39/16
[2019/37]
CPC:
F02B39/12 (EP,US); F02D23/005 (EP,US); F02B33/34 (CN);
F02B33/38 (EP,US); F02B33/40 (US); F02B37/12 (US);
F02D21/08 (US); F02D41/0007 (EP,CN,US); F02B2039/164 (EP,US);
F02B2039/168 (EP,US); F02B37/162 (EP,US); F02D2200/021 (US);
F02D41/064 (EP,US); Y02T10/12 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/50]
Former [2019/37]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:LADEVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN MOTOR, MOTOR, VERFAHREN ZUM LADEN EINES MOTORS UND COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT[2019/37]
English:SUPERCHARGING DEVICE FOR ENGINE, ENGINE, METHOD OF SUPERCHARGING ENGINE, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT[2019/37]
French:DISPOSITIF DE SURALIMENTATION POUR MOTEUR, MOTEUR, PROCÉDÉ DE SURALIMENTATION DE MOTEUR ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR[2019/37]
Examination procedure30.10.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.10.2019Examination requested  [2019/50]
31.10.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
09.06.2020Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2020Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
20.08.2020Fee for grant paid
20.08.2020Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.07.2021No opposition filed within time limit [2021/36]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.02.2019
AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
MK30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE11.02.2021
LU11.02.2021
BE28.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
[2024/23]
Former [2023/33]HU11.02.2019
AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE11.02.2021
LU11.02.2021
BE28.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
Former [2023/30]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CY30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE11.02.2021
LU11.02.2021
BE28.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
Former [2022/34]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE11.02.2021
LU11.02.2021
BE28.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
Former [2022/23]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE11.02.2021
LU11.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
Former [2022/10]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
IE11.02.2021
LU11.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
Former [2022/07]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
IE11.02.2021
LU11.02.2021
FR28.02.2021
Former [2021/50]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SI30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
LU11.02.2021
Former [2021/48]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
IT30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
LU11.02.2021
Former [2021/47]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
LU11.02.2021
Former [2021/41]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
MC30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/37]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
DK30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/30]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
NL30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/28]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SK30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/25]AL30.09.2020
AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
ES30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
PL30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
IS30.01.2021
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/23]AT30.09.2020
CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/22]CZ30.09.2020
EE30.09.2020
FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RO30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
SM30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/21]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
PT01.02.2021
Former [2021/20]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LT30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/10]FI30.09.2020
HR30.09.2020
LV30.09.2020
RS30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
GR31.12.2020
Former [2021/08]FI30.09.2020
SE30.09.2020
BG30.12.2020
NO30.12.2020
Former [2021/07]FI30.09.2020
NO30.12.2020
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0304259  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP]) [X] 1,2,13-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * column 1 - column 4 * * column 6 - column 8 * [I] 3,4;
 [XA]JP2006342738  (MITSUBISHI MOTORS CORP) [X] 1,2,13-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 3 * * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] , [0019] , [0021] , [0022] , [0027] - [0033] * [A] 3-12;
 [A]WO2008118660  (BORGWARNER INC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figure 1 ** paragraphs [0028] , [0 33] , [0 34] , [0 62] , [0 77] , [0 82] , [0 85] , [0 86] , [0 90] , [0 91] *;
 [A]WO2013148205  (EATON CORP [US]) [A] 3,5 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * claims 3, 19 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0046] , [0049] *;
 [XAI]US2017016389  (XIAO BAITAO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,11,13-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 4 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0 18] , [0020] , [0024] , [0032] , [0040] - [0048] * [A] 9 [I] 3-8,12;
 [A]DE102016111789  (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1, 4 * * paragraphs [0013] , [0038] - [0044] *;
 [A]WO2017110612  (KCM CORP [JP]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3, 4A * * paragraphs [0023] , [0038] - [0062] *
by applicantJP2015129457
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.