blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3575637

EP3575637 - MOTOR VEHICLE DRIVE ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.05.2024
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  09.06.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  15.03.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.10.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.01.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HUF Hülsbeck & Fürst GmbH & Co. KG
Steeger Str. 17
42551 Velbert / DE
[2019/49]
Inventor(s)01 / KOCH, Andreas
Erich-Ollenhauer-Str. 41
42579 Heiligenhaus / DE
02 / TORKOWSKI, Thorsten
Viehauser Berg 12
45239 Essen / DE
03 / WIETKAMP, Stephan
Pienersallee 17a
48161 Münster / DE
 [2019/49]
Representative(s)Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Gutenbergstraße 39
45128 Essen / DE
[2023/28]
Former [2019/49]Zenz Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Rüttenscheider Straße 2
45128 Essen / DE
Application number, filing date19157779.018.02.2019
[2019/49]
Priority number, dateDE20181011270328.05.2018         Original published format: DE102018112703
[2019/49]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3575637
Date:04.12.2019
Language:DE
[2019/49]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3575637
Date:12.07.2023
Language:DE
[2023/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.09.2019
ClassificationIPC:F16H57/021
[2019/49]
CPC:
F16H57/021 (EP); E05B85/10 (CN); F16H2057/0213 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/09]
Former [2019/49]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:KRAFTFAHRZEUG-ANTRIEBSANORDNUNG[2019/49]
English:MOTOR VEHICLE DRIVE ASSEMBLY[2019/49]
French:SYST?ME D'ENTRAÎNEMENT DE VÉHICULE AUTOMOBILE[2019/49]
Examination procedure16.01.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.01.2020Examination requested  [2020/09]
16.01.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
23.10.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.11.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.03.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.03.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.05.2023Fee for grant paid
30.05.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.05.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)15.04.2024No opposition filed within time limit [2024/25]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCZ12.07.2023
DK12.07.2023
EE12.07.2023
ES12.07.2023
FI12.07.2023
HR12.07.2023
IT12.07.2023
LT12.07.2023
LV12.07.2023
NL12.07.2023
PL12.07.2023
RO12.07.2023
RS12.07.2023
SE12.07.2023
SK12.07.2023
SM12.07.2023
NO12.10.2023
GR13.10.2023
IS12.11.2023
PT13.11.2023
[2024/26]
Former [2024/23]CZ12.07.2023
DK12.07.2023
EE12.07.2023
ES12.07.2023
FI12.07.2023
HR12.07.2023
LT12.07.2023
LV12.07.2023
NL12.07.2023
PL12.07.2023
RO12.07.2023
RS12.07.2023
SE12.07.2023
SK12.07.2023
SM12.07.2023
NO12.10.2023
GR13.10.2023
IS12.11.2023
PT13.11.2023
Former [2024/22]CZ12.07.2023
DK12.07.2023
ES12.07.2023
FI12.07.2023
HR12.07.2023
LT12.07.2023
LV12.07.2023
NL12.07.2023
PL12.07.2023
RO12.07.2023
RS12.07.2023
SE12.07.2023
SM12.07.2023
NO12.10.2023
GR13.10.2023
IS12.11.2023
PT13.11.2023
Former [2024/20]ES12.07.2023
FI12.07.2023
HR12.07.2023
LT12.07.2023
LV12.07.2023
NL12.07.2023
PL12.07.2023
RS12.07.2023
SE12.07.2023
SM12.07.2023
NO12.10.2023
GR13.10.2023
IS12.11.2023
PT13.11.2023
Former [2024/10]ES12.07.2023
FI12.07.2023
HR12.07.2023
LT12.07.2023
LV12.07.2023
NL12.07.2023
PL12.07.2023
RS12.07.2023
SE12.07.2023
NO12.10.2023
GR13.10.2023
IS12.11.2023
PT13.11.2023
Former [2024/09]ES12.07.2023
FI12.07.2023
LT12.07.2023
NL12.07.2023
SE12.07.2023
NO12.10.2023
GR13.10.2023
IS12.11.2023
Former [2024/08]LT12.07.2023
NL12.07.2023
NO12.10.2023
GR13.10.2023
Former [2024/05]NL12.07.2023
Documents cited:Search[XI]DE10242570  (VALEO MOTOREN & AKTUATOREN [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0001] , [00 2] , [0 19] - [0035] * * figures 1-15 * [I] 5-20;
 [XI]EP1645761  (IMS GEAR GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-4 * the whole document * [I] 5-20;
 [XI]WO2008007736  (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1 * the whole document *[I] 2-20;
 [XI]WO2015036837  (KIEKERT AG [DE]) [X] 1-4,8,9,14-19 * page 1, line 1 - page 2, line 26 * * page 3, line 29 - page 4, line 29 * * page 5, line 23 - page 7, line 3 * * figures 1, 2, 3 * [I] 5-7,10-13,20;
 [XI]DE102014212133  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1-3,5 * paragraphs [0002] , [00 3] , [0 11] , [0 12] , [0 15] , [0 17] , [0 43] , [0 52] - [0054] * * figures 1-18 * [I] 4,6-20
ExaminationWO2018019864
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.