Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3511039 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3511039



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 214
11.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
11.11.2019 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
11.11.2019 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
11.11.2019 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
11.11.2019 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 4
11.11.2019 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
11.11.2019 Examination started Search / examination 1
11.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.08.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
06.08.2019 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 2
31.07.2019 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee (divisional application) Search / examination 2
22.07.2019 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
26.06.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
19.06.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
19.06.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
17.06.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
17.06.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 1
17.06.2019 European search report Search / examination 2
17.06.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
03.06.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
26.02.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
26.02.2019 Description Search / examination 51
26.02.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
26.02.2019 Drawings Search / examination 74
26.02.2019 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
23.11.2015 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 38