Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3528392

EP3528392 - COMMUNITY-BASED RESPONSE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  19.07.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Zoll Medical Corporation
269 Mill Road Chelmsford
Massachusetts 01824-4105 / US
[2019/34]
Inventor(s)01 / Barash, David
580 Washington St, 1109
Boston, MA 02111 / US
02 / Totman, Mark
38 Jefferson Road
Winchester, MA 01890 / US
03 / Freeman, Gary A
47 Stearns Street
Newton Center, MA 02159 / US
 [2019/34]
Representative(s)Potter Clarkson
The Belgrave Centre
Talbot Street
Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB
[2019/34]
Application number, filing date19159798.815.11.2010
[2019/34]
Priority number, dateUS200926127609P13.11.2009         Original published format: US 26127609 P
[2019/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3528392
Date:21.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/34]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04B7/00, G08B25/01, G08B25/14, G08B27/00, H04M1/725, H04W4/02, H04W4/12, H04W4/90, G16H40/20
[2019/34]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/34]
TitleGerman:COMMUNITY-BASIERTES ANTWORTSYSTEM[2019/34]
English:COMMUNITY-BASED RESPONSE SYSTEM[2019/34]
French:SYSTÈME DE RÉPONSE BASÉE SUR UNE COMMUNAUTÉ[2019/34]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10830876.8  / EP2499748
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
27.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[I]EP1879370  (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] , [0017] , [0022] , [0026] , [0028] *;
 [I]WO2004057901  (LANDONI GIOVANNI [IT]) [I] 1-15 * page 5, line 11 - page 8, line 9 * * Figures *;
 [I]US2008267360  (SPECTOR DONALD [US]) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0007] - paragraph [0021] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0058] - paragraph [0062] * * abstract *;
 [A]US2004172222  (SIMPSON THOMAS L C [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * paragraph [0232] *;
 [A]WO2005040997  (DIEGANE DIONE [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * paragraph [0076] *