Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP3525376 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3525376



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 191
09.09.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
02.09.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
20.08.2019 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
17.07.2019 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
25.06.2019 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
14.06.2019 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 2
11.06.2019 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
05.06.2019 European search opinion Search / examination 7
05.06.2019 European search report Search / examination 3
05.06.2019 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
21.05.2019 Search started Search / examination 1
20.05.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.05.2019 Designation of inventor Search / examination 2
20.05.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.05.2019 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
12.03.2019 Deficiency in designation of inventor Search / examination 1
28.02.2019 Abstract Search / examination 1
28.02.2019 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
28.02.2019 Claims Search / examination 3
28.02.2019 Description Search / examination 57
28.02.2019 Drawings Search / examination 19
28.02.2019 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 2
28.02.2019 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
30.07.2012 Priority document Search / examination 72