Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP3525376


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
17.07.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
12.07.2019 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
12.07.2019 Request for examination filed published on  14.08.2019  [2019/33]
05.03.2019 New entry: Renewal fee paid
01.03.2019 Change - representative