Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3525376

EP3525376 - UPLINK CONTROL SIGNAL DESIGN FOR WIRELESS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  12.07.2019
Database last updated on 19.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.07.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Apple Inc.
One Apple Park Way
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
[2019/33]
Inventor(s)01 / YU, Dong-Sheng
31 Westpointe Crescent
Ottawa, ON K2G 5Y9 / CA
02 / NIKOPOURDEILAMI, Hosein
236 Kohilo Crescent
Ottawa, ON K2G 0E6 / CA
03 / VRZIC, Sophie
169 Thombury Crescent
Nepean, ON K2G 6C2 / CA
04 / FONG, Mo-Han
95 Beech Street, Apt. 205
Ottawa, ON K1S 3J7 / CA
05 / NOVAK, Robert
1704-465 Richmond Road
Ottawa, ON K2A 1Z1 / CA
06 / YUAN, Jun
1405-2935 Richmond Road
Ottawa, ON K2B 8C9 / CA
 [2019/33]
Representative(s)Lang, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[2019/33]
Application number, filing date19159863.005.07.2010
[2019/33]
Priority number, dateUS200922298109P03.07.2009         Original published format: US 22298109 P
[2019/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3525376
Date:14.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.06.2019
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04W72/04, // H04L1/06, H04L1/18
[2019/33]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/33]
TitleGerman:DESIGN EINES UPLINK-KONTROLLSIGNALS FÜR DRAHTLOSES SYSTEM[2019/33]
English:UPLINK CONTROL SIGNAL DESIGN FOR WIRELESS SYSTEM[2019/33]
French:CONCEPTION DE SIGNAL DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE POUR SYSTÈME SANS FIL[2019/33]
Examination procedure28.02.2019Examination requested  [2019/33]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10793487.9  / EP2449842
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
28.02.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1892975  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0056] * * figures 3-5,10 *;
 [Y]WO2008126623  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP], et al) [Y] 1-15 * abstract *;
 [P]EP2139255  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [P] * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0082] - paragraph [0086] * * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0100] * * figures 11,14 *;
 [A]US2003095532  (KIM JAE-YOEL [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0056] * * figure 4 *
by applicantUS20090222981
 US20080078581