Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3513721

EP3513721 - COMPENSATION OF MOTION IN A MOVING ORGAN USING AN INTERNAL POSITION REFERENCE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.06.2019
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.09.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
20.09.2019Change - classificationpublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
20.09.2019Change - classificationpublished on 23.10.2019  [2019/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
St. Jude Medical, Atrial Fibrillation Division, Inc.
One St. Jude Medical Drive
St. Paul, Minnesota 55117 / US
[2019/30]
Inventor(s)01 / COHEN, Amit
15A Hahoresh Street
30500 Binyamina / IL
02 / EICHLER, Uzi
51 Liberia Street
3491420 Haifa / IL
03 / IZMIRLI, Alon
11 Hasigaliot Street
42930 Ganot Hadar / IL
 [2019/30]
Representative(s)Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
European Patent Attorneys
Landsberger Strasse 300
80687 München / DE
[2019/30]
Application number, filing date19162165.524.09.2010
[2019/30]
Priority number, dateUS20096509320931.12.2009         Original published format: US 65093209
[2019/30]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3513721
Date:24.07.2019
Language:EN
[2019/30]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3513721
Date:23.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/43]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B5/05, A61B6/00
[2019/30]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/30]
TitleGerman:BEWEGUNGSKOMPENSATION IN EINEM BEWEGTEN ORGAN MITHILFE EINES INTERNEN POSITIONSREFERENZSENSORS[2019/30]
English:COMPENSATION OF MOTION IN A MOVING ORGAN USING AN INTERNAL POSITION REFERENCE SENSOR[2019/30]
French:COMPENSATION DE MOUVEMENT DANS UN ORGANE EN MOUVEMENT À L'AIDE D'UN CAPTEUR DE RÉFÉRENCE DE POSITION INTERNE[2019/30]
Examination procedure12.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/30]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10841418.6  / EP2470072
Fees paidRenewal fee
12.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
12.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
12.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
12.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
12.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
12.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
12.03.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
11.09.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2001031919  (STROMMER GERA M [IL], et al) [X] 1,3-10,12,13 * figures 1, 7A * * paragraphs [0063] - [0065] - [ 0119] - [0130] * [I] 2,11;
 [A]WO0054689  (ACCURAY INC [US]) [A] 1-13 * page 3, line 9 - line 16 * * page 15, line 10 - page 16, line 21 * * figures 5, 6, 10 *;
 [A]WO2009149409  (CALYPSO MED TECHNOLOGIES INC [US], et al) [A] 1-13 * figures 5, 6 * * paragraphs [0015] , [ 0020] , [ 0025] - [0028] *;
 [A]US2009149741  (HEIGL BENNO [DE]) [A] 1-13 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0013] , [ 0015] , [ 0019] *
by applicantUS7386339
 US7197354
 US7343195
 US2006058647
 US6233476
 US20010949160
 US20080233420