blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3708483

EP3708483 - HOLDING DEVICE FOR WALL MODULES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2020/38]CLAMPING AND HOLDING DEVICE FOR WALL MODULES
[2021/19]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.07.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.08.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  09.05.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  19.03.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  14.08.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SFS Group International AG
Rosenbergsaustrasse 8
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
[2022/14]
Former [2020/38]For all designated states
SFS Intec Holding AG
Rosenbergsaustrasse 8
9435 Heerbrugg / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Dibowski, Marc
Querbülten 1
21435 Stelle / DE
02 / Diehl, Benjamin
Emsener Berg 19b
21224 Rosengarten / DE
03 / Costabel, Sascha
Meisenweg 8
71131 Jettingen / DE
 [2020/38]
Application number, filing date19162939.314.03.2019
[2020/38]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3708483
Date:16.09.2020
Language:DE
[2020/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3708483
Date:15.09.2021
Language:DE
[2021/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.09.2019
ClassificationIPC:B64C1/06
[2020/38]
CPC:
B64C1/066 (EP,US); B64C1/403 (CN,US); F16B2/10 (US);
Y02T50/40 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/16]
Former [2020/38]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR WANDMODULE[2021/19]
English:HOLDING DEVICE FOR WALL MODULES[2021/19]
French:DISPOSITIF DE MAINTIEN POUR MODULES MURAUX[2021/19]
Former [2020/38]KLEMM- UND HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR WANDMODULE
Former [2020/38]CLAMPING AND HOLDING DEVICE FOR WALL MODULES
Former [2020/38]DISPOSITIF DE SERRAGE ET DE MAINTIEN POUR MODULES MURAUX
Examination procedure04.03.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.03.2021Examination requested  [2021/16]
16.03.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.05.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.08.2021Fee for grant paid
03.08.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.08.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.06.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU14.03.2019
AL15.09.2021
CY15.09.2021
CZ15.09.2021
DK15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
IT15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
MC15.09.2021
MK15.09.2021
NL15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RO15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SI15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
SM15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
IS15.01.2022
PT17.01.2022
IE14.03.2022
LU14.03.2022
BE31.03.2022
CH31.03.2022
LI31.03.2022
[2024/25]
Former [2024/23]AL15.09.2021
CY15.09.2021
CZ15.09.2021
DK15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
IT15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
MC15.09.2021
MK15.09.2021
NL15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RO15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SI15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
SM15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
IS15.01.2022
PT17.01.2022
IE14.03.2022
LU14.03.2022
BE31.03.2022
CH31.03.2022
LI31.03.2022
Former [2024/20]AL15.09.2021
CY15.09.2021
CZ15.09.2021
DK15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
IT15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
MC15.09.2021
NL15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RO15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SI15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
SM15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
IS15.01.2022
PT17.01.2022
IE14.03.2022
LU14.03.2022
BE31.03.2022
CH31.03.2022
LI31.03.2022
Former [2023/10]AL15.09.2021
CZ15.09.2021
DK15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
IT15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
MC15.09.2021
NL15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RO15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SI15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
SM15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
IS15.01.2022
PT17.01.2022
IE14.03.2022
LU14.03.2022
BE31.03.2022
CH31.03.2022
LI31.03.2022
Former [2023/09]AL15.09.2021
CZ15.09.2021
DK15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
MC15.09.2021
NL15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RO15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SI15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
SM15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
IS15.01.2022
PT17.01.2022
IE14.03.2022
LU14.03.2022
CH31.03.2022
LI31.03.2022
Former [2023/08]AL15.09.2021
CZ15.09.2021
DK15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
MC15.09.2021
NL15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RO15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SI15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
SM15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
IS15.01.2022
PT17.01.2022
IE14.03.2022
LU14.03.2022
Former [2022/47]AL15.09.2021
CZ15.09.2021
DK15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
MC15.09.2021
NL15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RO15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SI15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
SM15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
IS15.01.2022
PT17.01.2022
Former [2022/36]AL15.09.2021
CZ15.09.2021
DK15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
NL15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RO15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SI15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
SM15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
IS15.01.2022
PT17.01.2022
Former [2022/29]AL15.09.2021
CZ15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
NL15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RO15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
SM15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
IS15.01.2022
PT17.01.2022
Former [2022/25]CZ15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
NL15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RO15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
SM15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
IS15.01.2022
PT17.01.2022
Former [2022/24]CZ15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
NL15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RO15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
IS15.01.2022
PT17.01.2022
Former [2022/23]CZ15.09.2021
EE15.09.2021
ES15.09.2021
FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
PL15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
SK15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
PT17.01.2022
Former [2022/10]FI15.09.2021
HR15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
LV15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
GR16.12.2021
Former [2022/09]FI15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
RS15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
Former [2022/08]FI15.09.2021
LT15.09.2021
SE15.09.2021
BG15.12.2021
NO15.12.2021
Former [2022/07]LT15.09.2021
NO15.12.2021
Documents cited:Search[X]US3142103  (MARTIN LINDBLAD STIG) [X] 1,3-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP0561107  (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [A]DE4208493  (DEUTSCHE AEROSPACE AIRBUS [DE]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *;
 [XI]US5680680  (LACONTE RICHARD J [US]) [X] 1,3-5 * column 2, line 17 - column 3, line 12; figure - * [I] 7,9;
 [XI]US2014090211  (KALMAN STEVE HENRY [US]) [X] 1-6 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0040]; figure - * [I] 7,9-11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.