EP3553303 - GAS TURBINE ENGINE AND TURBINE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.10.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 13.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.11.2020 [2020/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc Kings Place 90 York Way London N1 9FX / GB | [2020/09] |
Former [2019/42] | For all designated states Rolls-Royce plc 62 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6AT / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Townes, Roderick c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | 02 /
Sadler, Keith c/o Rolls-Royce plc PO Box 31 Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB | [2019/42] | Representative(s) | Rolls-Royce plc Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48 PO Box 31 Derby DE24 8BJ / GB | [2019/42] | Application number, filing date | 19164268.5 | 21.03.2019 | [2019/42] | Priority number, date | GB20180005854 | 09.04.2018 Original published format: GB 201805854 | [2019/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3553303 | Date: | 16.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02K3/06, F02C7/36, F02K3/072 | [2019/42] | CPC: |
F02C7/36 (EP,US);
F02C3/13 (US);
F02C3/10 (US);
F02C7/268 (US);
F02C9/16 (US);
F02K3/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/42] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GASTURBINENMOTOR UND TURBINENANORDNUNG | [2019/42] | English: | GAS TURBINE ENGINE AND TURBINE ARRANGEMENT | [2019/42] | French: | MOTEUR À TURBINE À GAZ ET AGENCEMENT DE TURBINE | [2019/42] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/47] | 26.06.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2020/47] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP3112613 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,10,11,14,15 * paragraphs [0033] , [0048]; figures 3,6 *; | [X]US2016298539 (ROBERGE GARY D [US]) [X] 1,3,10,14,15 * paragraphs [0018] , [0031] , [0032]; figures 1,6 *; | [XI]US2006272314 (MONIZ THOMAS O [US], et al) [X] 1,2,10,14,15 * paragraphs [0016] , [0033] - [0035]; figures 2,3 * [I] 4; | [X]EP3242000 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,14,15 * paragraphs [0032] , [0057]; figure 1C *; | [XP]WO2018147950 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [XP] 1,2,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0011] , [0055] , [0058] , [0059] , [0064] , [0070]; figure 3 *; | [XP]WO2018169578 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [XP] 1,2,14,15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0046]; figure 2 * |