Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3550671

EP3550671 - RELAY TERMINAL AND RELAY CONNECTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.09.2019
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip05.12.2019Change - designated statespublished on 01.01.2020 [2020/01]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
YAZAKI CORPORATION
4-28, Mita 1-chome
Minato-ku
Tokyo 108-8333 / JP
[2019/41]
Inventor(s)01 / MORI, Shigeo
c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd.
653-2 Osaka
Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 437-1421 / JP
02 / SUGIYAMA, Fuminori
c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd.
653-2 Osaka
Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 437-1421 / JP
03 / TANAKA, Hiroyuki
c/o Yazaki Parts Co., Ltd.
653-2 Osaka
Kakegawa-shi, Shizuoka 437-1421 / JP
 [2019/41]
Representative(s)Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB
Leopoldstraße 4
80802 München / DE
[2019/41]
Application number, filing date19165055.526.03.2019
[2019/41]
Priority number, dateJP2018007162803.04.2018         Original published format: JP 2018071628
[2019/41]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3550671
Date:09.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/41]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.08.2019
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/11, H01R13/187, H01R13/631, H01R25/00, H01R13/24, H01H45/14
[2019/41]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/01]
Former [2019/41]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:RELAISENDGERÄT UND RELAISSTECKER[2019/41]
English:RELAY TERMINAL AND RELAY CONNECTOR[2019/41]
French:TERMINAL RELAIS ET CONNECTEUR RELAIS[2019/41]
Examination procedure26.03.2019Examination requested  [2019/41]
26.11.2019Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2012058807  (HARTING ELECTRONICS GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [I] 6
by applicantJP2009099429