blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3666097

EP3666097 - ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.10.2022
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  19.11.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  30.06.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.11.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.07.2024  [2024/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Liu, Tuanfang
Room 1603, No.4, Shajingxiyuan
No. 8230 Bao'an Avenue
Bao'an District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518000 / CN
[2021/30]
Former [2020/25]For all designated states
Liu, Tuanfang
Room 1603, No.4, Shajingxiyuan
No. 8230 Baoan Avenue
Baoan District
518000 Shenzhen, Guangdong / CN
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2020/25]
Representative(s)Lang, Christian
LangPatent Anwaltskanzlei IP Law Firm
Ingolstädter Straße 5
80807 München / DE
[2021/51]
Former [2020/25]Hryszkiewicz, Danuta
Matthias Scholl, Inc.
Friedrichstrasse 123
10117 Berlin / DE
Application number, filing date19166444.001.04.2019
[2020/25]
Priority number, dateCN20181150111610.12.2018         Original published format: CN201811501116
CN20182259326U10.12.2018         Original published format: CN 201822059326 U
[2020/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3666097
Date:17.06.2020
Language:EN
[2020/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3666097
Date:22.12.2021
Language:EN
[2021/51]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.11.2019
ClassificationIPC:A24F47/00, A24F40/40
[2021/17]
CPC:
A24F40/40 (EP,US); H05B3/46 (US); A24F40/46 (US);
A24F7/02 (US); F16J15/022 (US); H05B1/0297 (US);
H05B3/03 (US); A24F15/015 (EP,US); A24F40/485 (EP,US);
A24F7/00 (EP,US); H05B3/00 (US); H05B3/40 (US);
H05B3/42 (US) (-)
Former IPC [2020/25]A24F47/00
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/51]
Former [2020/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE ZIGARETTE[2020/25]
English:ELECTRONIC CIGARETTE[2020/25]
French:CIGARETTE ÉLECTRONIQUE[2020/25]
Examination procedure05.11.2020Examination requested  [2020/51]
05.11.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
01.07.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.10.2021Fee for grant paid
22.10.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
11.11.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)23.09.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/48]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.04.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Stay/Interruption14.06.2019Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died[2021/01]
15.03.2021Resumption of proceedings[2021/14]
14.06.2019Interruption of proceedings. Reason: representative has died[2021/14]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU01.04.2019
AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CY22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
IT22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
MK22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
TR22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IE01.04.2022
LU01.04.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
BE30.04.2022
CH30.04.2022
LI30.04.2022
[2024/29]
Former [2024/25]HU01.04.2019
AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CY22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
IT22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
MK22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IE01.04.2022
LU01.04.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
BE30.04.2022
CH30.04.2022
LI30.04.2022
Former [2024/23]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CY22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
IT22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
MK22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IE01.04.2022
LU01.04.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
BE30.04.2022
CH30.04.2022
LI30.04.2022
Former [2024/20]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CY22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
IT22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IE01.04.2022
LU01.04.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
BE30.04.2022
CH30.04.2022
LI30.04.2022
Former [2023/27]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
IT22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IE01.04.2022
LU01.04.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
BE30.04.2022
CH30.04.2022
LI30.04.2022
Former [2023/20]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IE01.04.2022
LU01.04.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
BE30.04.2022
CH30.04.2022
LI30.04.2022
Former [2023/10]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SI22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
LU01.04.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
BE30.04.2022
CH30.04.2022
LI30.04.2022
Former [2023/09]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
LU01.04.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
CH30.04.2022
LI30.04.2022
Former [2023/08]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
LU01.04.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2023/06]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
MC22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/49]AL22.12.2021
AT22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/46]AT22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
DK22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/42]AT22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
IS22.04.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/36]AT22.12.2021
CZ22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
PL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/35]CZ22.12.2021
EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SK22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/34]EE22.12.2021
ES22.12.2021
FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RO22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
PT22.04.2022
Former [2022/33]FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
SM22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
Former [2022/30]FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
NL22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
Former [2022/25]FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
NO22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
Former [2022/24]FI22.12.2021
HR22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
LV22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
SE22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
GR23.03.2022
Former [2022/22]FI22.12.2021
LT22.12.2021
RS22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
Former [2022/21]RS22.12.2021
BG22.03.2022
Former [2022/19]BG22.03.2022
Documents cited:Search[A]EP3141136  (LIU TUANFANG [CN]) [A] 1,2 * paragraphs [0013] - [0015]; figures 1-4c *;
 [A]EP3278679  (LIU TUANFANG [CN]) [A] 1,2* paragraph [0016]; figures 1-3 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.