EP3550493 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING AI-BASED COST ESTIMATES FOR SERVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 18.02.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 06.09.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 23.03.2022 [2022/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yembo, Inc. 6540 Lusk Boulevard Suite C112 San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2019/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RATTNER, Zachary 10559 Westonhill Drive San Diego, California 92126 / US | 02 /
MOHAN, Siddharth 3994 Carmel Brooks Way San Diego, California 92130 / US | 03 /
GUPTA, Vikram 4734 Caminito Lapiz San Diego, California 92130 / US | [2019/48] |
Former [2019/41] | 01 /
RATTNER, Zachary 10559 Westonhill Drive San Diego, California 92126 / US | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2019/41] | Application number, filing date | 19167503.2 | 05.04.2019 | [2019/41] | Priority number, date | US201862654163P | 06.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862654163 P | US201916374449 | 03.04.2019 Original published format: US201916374449 | [2019/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3550493 | Date: | 09.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/02, G06Q50/30, G06Q10/04, G06Q10/06 | [2019/41] | CPC: |
G06Q10/06315 (EP);
G06Q10/04 (EP);
G06Q30/0283 (EP);
G06Q50/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2019/41] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON AI-BASIERTEN KOSTENSCHÄTZUNGEN FÜR DIENSTE | [2019/41] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR PROVIDING AI-BASED COST ESTIMATES FOR SERVICES | [2019/41] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR FOURNIR DES ESTIMATIONS DE COÛT DE SERVICES BASÉES SUR L'IA | [2019/41] | Examination procedure | 03.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 03.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.07.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2022/12] | 22.10.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.10.2021 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 02.11.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2022/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013132295 (HOROWITZ ALAN [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * figures 2-9 *; | [A]US2015371305 (GANAPATHY VENKATESH [US]) [A] 1-16* paragraph [0030] *; | [I]US2016292761 (SARIC ADNAN [US]) [I] 1-16 * paragraphs [0010] - [0011] - [0027] - [0081] *; | [X]WO2017191525 (YEMBO INC [US]) [X] 1-16 * paragraphs [0003] - [0004] - [0019] , [0022] - [0025] - [0 31] - [0032] - [0045] - [0047] - [0049] , [0056] - [0060] - [0 68]; figures 1,4 *; | [I]KR20170135260 (KIM MYONG IM [KR]) [I] 1-16 * claims 1-7 * |