Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3552869

EP3552869 - SEAT SYSTEMS FOR EMERGENCY VEHICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 19.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2019Publication of search reportpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
01.11.2019Change - classificationpublished on 04.12.2019  [2019/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Seats Incorporated
1515 Industrial Street
Reedsburg, WI 53959 / US
[2019/42]
Inventor(s)01 / VAN ZYL, Pieter
1515 Industrial Street
Reedsburg, WI Wisconsin 53959 / US
02 / BREY, Joe
1515 Industrial Street
Reedsburg, WI Wisconsin 53959 / US
03 / DOWNING, Ryan
1515 Industrial Street
Reedsburg, WI Wisconsin 53959 / US
04 / BAUER, Kerry
1515 Industrial Street
Reedsburg, WI Wisconsin 53959 / US
05 / HAHN, Doug
1515 Industrial Street
Reedsburg, WI Wisconsin 53959 / US
06 / BOYARSKI, Jesse
1515 Industrial Street
Reedsburg, WI Wisconsin 53959 / US
07 / GREENWOOD, Laine
1515 Industrial Street
Reedsburg, WI Wisconsin 53959 / US
08 / KLEINSCHMIDT, Katie
1515 Industrial Street
Reedsburg, WI Wisconsin 53959 / US
 [2019/42]
Representative(s)Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[2019/42]
Application number, filing date19168286.309.04.2019
[2019/42]
Priority number, dateUS201862654905P09.04.2018         Original published format: US 201862654905 P
[2019/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3552869
Date:16.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/42]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3552869
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.11.2019
ClassificationInternational:B60N2/22, B60N2/90, B60N2/24, A62B9/04, F17C13/08, B60N2/64, A62B25/00
[2019/49]
Former International [2019/42]B60N2/22, B60N2/90, B60N2/24, A62B9/04, F17C13/08, B60N2/64
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/42]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SITZSYSTEME FÜR NOTFALLFAHRZEUGE[2019/42]
English:SEAT SYSTEMS FOR EMERGENCY VEHICLES[2019/42]
French:SYSTÈMES DE SIÈGE POUR VÉHICULES DE SECOURS[2019/42]
Documents cited:Search[XYI]JP2017124787  (MAGICAL TECHNICA CO LTD) [X] 1-3,15 * figures 1,2,4,6 * [Y] 8-10 [I] 4-7,14;
 [XI]JPS5639928  (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1,2,4-7,15 * figures 3,4,5,7 * [I] 14;
 [YA]EP1419062  (H O BOSTROM COMPANY INC [US]) [Y] 8-10 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026]; figure 3 * [A] 1,11-13;
 [A]US5934749  (POND GEORGE M [US], et al) [A] 1,8 * figures 1,4 *;
 [A]US2012139304  (JANG JAE HO [KR]) [A] 1,8 * figures 1,7 *