blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3567796

EP3567796 - STRUCTURED FILE ENCRYPTION PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  09.10.2020
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip09.10.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 11.11.2020  [2020/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rolls-Royce plc
Kings Place
90 York Way
London N1 9FX / GB
[2020/09]
Former [2019/46]For all designated states
Rolls-Royce plc
62 Buckingham Gate
London SW1E 6AT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Lapworth, Bryan
c/o Rolls-Royce plc
PO Box 31
Derby, Derbyshire DE24 8BJ / GB
 [2019/46]
Representative(s)Rolls-Royce plc
Moor Lane (ML-9)
PO Box 31
Derby DE24 8BJ / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/46]Rolls-Royce plc
Intellectual Property Dept SinA-48
PO Box 31
Derby DE24 8BJ / GB
Application number, filing date19168701.111.04.2019
[2019/46]
Priority number, dateGB2018000761210.05.2018         Original published format: GB 201807612
[2019/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3567796
Date:13.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.09.2019
ClassificationIPC:H04L9/06, G06F21/62
[2019/46]
CPC:
H04L9/0637 (EP,US); G06F16/258 (US); G06F21/602 (US);
G06F21/6209 (EP); H04L2209/125 (EP); H04L9/50 (US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/46]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:STRUKTURIERTER DATEIVERSCHLÜSSELUNGSPROZESS[2019/46]
English:STRUCTURED FILE ENCRYPTION PROCESS[2019/46]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE CHIFFREMENT DE FICHIERS STRUCTURÉS[2019/46]
Examination procedure03.06.2020Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2020/46]
25.06.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2020/46]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]EP0908810  (GEN INSTRUMENT CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,8-10,15 * paragraphs [0152] , [ 203]; figure 6 * [I] 3-7,11-14;
 [XI]US2001033656  (GLIGOR VIRGIL DORIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6,15 * paragraphs [0145] - [0147] - [ 152] , [ 153]; figures 11, 13 *[I] 3,4,7-14;
 [XI]EP1294124  (CIT ALCATEL [FR]) [X] 1,2,15 * paragraphs [0041] , [0 42] , [0 47] - [0053] * [I] 3-14;
 [XI]US2009013016  (NOLL LANDON CURT [US], et al) [X] 1-5,7,10,13,15 * paragraphs [0029] , [0 32] , [0 37] - [0047] - [0 51] , [0 52]; figures 2,3 * [I] 6,8,9,11,12,14
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.