blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3531408

EP3531408 - TRANSPARENT DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.03.2021
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.02.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  26.07.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.01.2025New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 16677 / KR
[2019/35]
Inventor(s)01 / LEE, Chang-soo
103-605, Samsung Apt., Seosan-si
Chungcheongnam-do / KR
02 / LEE, Geun-ho
703-1702, Jeongdeunmaeul Hanjin 7-danji Apt.
Jeongia-dong, Bundang-gu,Seongnam-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / YUN, Il-kook
108-401, Sinmaetan Weve Haneulchae Apt., Maetan
3-dong, Yeongtong-gu,Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2019/35]
Representative(s)HGF
HGF Limited
1 City Walk
Leeds LS11 9DX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2019/35]HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St. Saviourgate
York YO1 8NQ / GB
Application number, filing date19169668.108.04.2013
[2019/35]
Priority number, dateKR2012003647508.04.2012         Original published format: KR 20120036475
[2019/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3531408
Date:28.08.2019
Language:EN
[2019/35]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3531408
Date:13.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.10.2019
ClassificationIPC:G09G3/32, G09G3/20
[2019/35]
CPC:
G06F3/0304 (EP,KR,US); G09F9/00 (KR); G09G3/3208 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,KR,US); G06F3/04815 (EP,KR,US); G06V20/20 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G09F9/35 (KR); G09G3/20 (EP,US); G09G2320/0261 (EP,US);
G09G2340/0464 (EP,US); G09G2340/12 (EP,US); G09G2340/14 (EP,US);
G09G2354/00 (EP,CN,KR,US); G09G2380/10 (EP,CN,KR,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/13]
Former [2019/35]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:TRANSPARENTE ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN DAFÜR[2019/35]
English:TRANSPARENT DISPLAY APPARATUS AND METHOD THEREOF[2019/35]
French:APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE TRANSPARENT ET SON PROCÉDÉ[2019/35]
Examination procedure17.02.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
17.02.2020Examination requested  [2020/13]
17.02.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
10.03.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
14.11.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.03.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.01.2025Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13162683.0  / EP2657929
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
16.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
22.04.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
21.04.2021Renewal fee patent year 09
22.04.2022Renewal fee patent year 10
20.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 11
23.04.2024Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]JP2001117684  (FUJITSU GENERAL LTD);
 [XY]WO2008012716  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al);
 [X]EP2194468  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]);
 [Y]JP2011118807  (SANDEN SHOJI KK)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.