Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3536358

EP3536358 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING INFLAMMATORY RESPONSE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  09.08.2019
Database last updated on 24.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip09.08.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 11.09.2019  [2019/37]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2019/37]
Inventor(s)01 / Stevenson, Eric
1531 Pheasant Ridge Drive
San Antonio, TX Texas 78248 / US
02 / Norbury, Kenneth Carl
9718 Cameron Creek
San Antonio, TX Texas 78251 / US
03 / Mormino, Richard Paul
201 Delaware Street
San Antonio, TX Texas 78210 / US
04 / Hutchinson, George
7011 Washita Way
San Antonio, TX Texas 78256 / US
 [2019/37]
Representative(s)Simmons & Simmons
City Point
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[2019/37]
Application number, filing date19170668.815.05.2009
[2019/37]
Priority number, dateUS20080098030P18.09.2008         Original published format: US 98030 P
[2019/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3536358
Date:11.09.2019
Language:EN
[2019/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.07.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00
[2019/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/37]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINER ENTZÜNDUNGSREAKTION[2019/37]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR CONTROLLING INFLAMMATORY RESPONSE[2019/37]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE CONTRÔLE DE RÉPONSE INFLAMMATOIRE[2019/37]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09789691.4  / EP2323712
EP14157544.9  / EP2740501
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
23.04.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2007282309  (BENGTSON BRADLEY P [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,11 * abstract * * paragraphs [0037] - [0046] * [Y] 6,12 [I] 5,13;
 [Y]US2002068913  (FLEISCHMANN WILHELM [DE]) [Y] 6,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0021] - [0025] *;
 [A]US6537241  (ODLAND RICK MATHEW [US]) [A] 1-13 * figure -; claim 1 * * column 14, lines 26-31 * * column 15, lines 1-7 *;
 [A]WO2008040020  (PURICORE INC [US], et al) [A] 6,12 * figure 6; claims 1-3 * * page 15, line 14 - page 16, line 4 * * page 28, lines 26-32 * * page 31, line 30 - page 32, line 5 *;
 [A]US2008167593  (FLEISCHMANN WILHELM [DE]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - * * paragraphs [0043] - [0046] *;
 [A]DE2754775  (HILBER CONTZ DR MED) [A] 1-13 * figure -; claim - * * page 4, lines 23-36 *;
 [A]US2008132819  (RADL CHRISTOPHER L [US], et al) [A] 5 * abstract *