Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3552784

EP3552784 - MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR FLOOR PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.09.2019
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
13.09.2019Request for examination filedpublished on 16.10.2019  [2019/42]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ceraloc Innovation AB
Prästavägen 513
263 65 Viken / SE
[2019/42]
Inventor(s)01 / PERVAN, Darko
Bygatan 30
SE-263 61 VIKEN / SE
 [2019/42]
Representative(s)Välinge Innovation AB
Patent Department
Prästavägen 513
263 65 Viken / SE
[2019/42]
Application number, filing date19173607.328.08.2012
[2019/42]
Priority number, dateSE2011005077829.08.2011         Original published format: SE 1150778
SE2011005080306.09.2011         Original published format: SE 1150803
[2019/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3552784
Date:16.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/42]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.09.2019
ClassificationInternational:B26D1/14, B26D3/06, E04F15/02, E04F15/10, E04F15/18, E04C2/40, B26D1/00, E04C2/38
[2019/42]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/42]
TitleGerman:MECHANISCHES ARRETIERUNGSSYSTEM FÜR BODENPLATTEN[2019/42]
English:MECHANICAL LOCKING SYSTEM FOR FLOOR PANELS[2019/42]
French:SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE MÉCANIQUE POUR PANNEAUX DE PLANCHER[2019/42]
Examination procedure09.05.2019Examination requested  [2019/42]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP12826931.3  / EP2751356
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
09.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
20.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
Documents cited:Search[XI]ES2350339  (ALAI PLASTICOS SA [ES]) [X] 1,4-7,13-15 * column 3, lines 58-63; figures 1-3,4,6 * [I] 12;
 [X]WO2010072357  (PARCOLYS N V [BE], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8,13-15 * page 5; figures 1,6,7 *;
 [XI]US5190799  (ELLINGSON III CHESTER W [US]) [X] 1,2,5,7 * column 2, lines 51-65 * * column 3, lines 19-26 * [I] 3,9