Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3561197

EP3561197 - PANEL, COVERING AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING SUCH PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  27.09.2019
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip04.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Flooring Industries Limited, SARL
10b, Rue des Mérovingiens (ZI Bourmicht)
8070 Bertrange / LU
[2019/44]
Inventor(s)01 / CAPPELLE, Mark
Cardijnlaan 8
B-8840 Staden / BE
 [2019/44]
Representative(s)Versaevel, Sebastien
Mohawk International Services, BVBA
Ooigemstraat 3
8710 Wielsbeke / BE
[2019/44]
Application number, filing date19175669.122.12.2009
[2019/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3561197
Date:30.10.2019
Language:EN
[2019/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3561197
Date:06.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/45]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:E04F15/10
[2019/44]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/44]
TitleGerman:PANEEL, BELAG UND VERFAHREN ZUM INSTALLIEREN SOLCHER PANEELE[2019/44]
English:PANEL, COVERING AND METHOD FOR INSTALLING SUCH PANELS[2019/44]
French:PANNEAU, REVÊTEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'INSTALLATION DE TELS PANNEAUX[2019/44]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP09015855.1  / EP2339092
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
21.05.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
03.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
Documents cited:Search[X]DE202008011589U  (AKZENTA PANEELE & PROFILE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1-7 * paragraphs [0012] , [0 13] , [0028] - [0032] - [0037] - [0039]; figures 2a, 2b, 4a, 4b *;
 [A]US6591568  (PAALSSON JOERGEN [SE]) [A] 1-7 * figures 3,7 *;
 [A]WO2007141605  (FLOORING IND LTD [IE], et al) [A] 1-7 * figures 1-6 *;
 [A]WO2009061279  (VAELINGE INNOVATION AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-7 * figure 5 *
by applicantUS2002189183
 US6306318
 WO9747834