Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3574780

EP3574780 - NON-COMBUSTION TYPE FLAVOR INHALER AND AEROSOL DELIVERY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  13.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2019First examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Japan Tobacco Inc.
2-1 Toranomon 2-chome, Minato-ku
Tokyo 105-8422 / JP
[2019/49]
Inventor(s)01 / KATAYAMA, Kazuhiko
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC., 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
02 / SUZUKI, Akihiko
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC., 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
03 / TAKEUCHI, Manabu
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC., 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
04 / NAKANO, Takuma
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC., 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
05 / YAMADA, Manabu
c/o JAPAN TOBACCO INC., 17-7 Yokokawa 1-chome
Sumida-ku
Tokyo, Tokyo 130-8603 / JP
 [2019/49]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Behnisch Barth Charles
Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[2019/49]
Application number, filing date19180641.329.05.2015
[2019/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3574780
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP05.11.2019
ClassificationInternational:A24F47/00, A61M15/06
[2019/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
TitleGerman:GESCHMACKSINHALATOR VOM VERBRENNUNGSFREIEN TYP UND AEROSOLAUSGABEVERFAHREN[2019/49]
English:NON-COMBUSTION TYPE FLAVOR INHALER AND AEROSOL DELIVERY METHOD[2019/49]
French:INHALATEUR D'ARÔME DE TYPE SANS COMBUSTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE DISTRIBUTION D'AÉROSOL[2019/49]
Examination procedure17.06.2019Examination requested  [2019/49]
05.11.2019Date on which the examining division has become responsible
18.11.2019Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15894110.4  / EP3289894
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
17.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
17.06.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2014182608  (EGOYANTS PETR ALEXANDROVICH [RU], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0047] - [0085] * [I] 2-5,8;
 [XI]WO2014102091  (PHILIP MORRIS PROD [CH]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * page 12, line 35 - page 17, line 34 * [I] 2-5,8;
 [XI]WO2014054035  (SMART CHIP MICROELECTRONIC CO LTD [CN]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0046] * [I] 2-5,8;
 [XI]US2014321837  (FLICK JEAN-MARC [CH]) [X] 1,9 * abstract * * paragraphs [0070] - [0107] * [I] 2-5,8;
 [A]US2014299141  (FLICK JEAN-MARC [CH]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *
by applicantJPH1189551
 WO2015JP63036