blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3567416

EP3567416 - PHOTONIC CRYSTAL SPECTROMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  10.03.2023
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.07.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.03.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  11.10.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.03.2023Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 12.04.2023  [2023/15]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York
412 Low Memorial Library
535 West 116th Street
New York, NY 10027 / US
[2019/46]
Inventor(s)01 / PERVEZ, Nadia
113 S. 2nd Street, no. 1A
Brooklyn, NY New York 11211 / US
02 / KYMISSIS, Ioannis
526 W. 113th Street, no. 43
New York, NY New York 10025 / US
03 / ZHANG, Jla
527 W. 121st Street, no. 42
New York, NY New York 10027 / US
04 / COX, Marshall
400 W. 119th Street 2K
New York, NY New York 10027 / US
 [2019/46]
Representative(s)Pennacchio, Salvatore Giovanni
Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A.
Via Senato, 8
20121 Milano / IT
[2019/46]
Application number, filing date19184457.011.10.2010
[2019/46]
Priority number, dateUS200927877309P12.10.2009         Original published format: US 27877309 P
US201034957010P28.05.2010         Original published format: US 34957010 P
[2019/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3567416
Date:13.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.10.2019
ClassificationIPC:G02B27/42
[2019/46]
CPC:
G01J3/0205 (EP,US); G01J3/02 (EP,US); G01J3/0259 (EP,US);
G01J3/12 (EP,US); G02B1/005 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/18]
Former [2019/46]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:PHOTONISCHES KRISTALLSPEKTROMETER[2019/46]
English:PHOTONIC CRYSTAL SPECTROMETER[2019/46]
French:SPECTROMÈTRE À CRISTAL PHOTONIQUE[2019/46]
Examination procedure25.03.2020Examination requested  [2020/18]
25.03.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
11.05.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.07.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2022Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2023/15]
07.12.2022Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2023/15]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10823905.4  / EP2488912
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
04.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
04.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
04.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
04.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
04.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
04.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
17.02.2021Renewal fee patent year 11
07.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 12
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.202011   M06   Fee paid on   17.02.2021
31.10.202213   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US6226083  (SCHWERZEL ROBERT E [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 4,5,6,9 *;
 [I]US2005117843  (CATCHMARK JEFFREY M [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figure 13; example 7 *;
 [I]  - TAILLAERT D ET AL, "AN OUT-OF-PLANE GRATING COUPLER FOR EFFICIENT BUTT-COUPLING BETWEEN COMPACT PLANAR WAVEGUIDES AND SINGLE-MODE FIBERS", IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA, (20020701), vol. 38, no. 7, doi:10.1109/JQE.2002.1017613, ISSN 0018-9197, pages 949 - 955, XP001169039 [I] 1-15 * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JQE.2002.1017613
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.