Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3572026

EP3572026 - SURGICAL INSTRUMENT WITH DUAL MODE END EFFECTOR AND SIDE-LOADED CLAMP ARM ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.10.2019
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.10.2019Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletinpublished on 27.11.2019  [2019/48]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ethicon LLC
475 Street C, Suite 401
Los Frailes Industrial Park
Guaynabo 00969 / PR
[2019/48]
Inventor(s)01 / BOUDREAUX, Chad P.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
02 / CLAUDA, Phillip H.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
03 / SCHULTE, John B.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
04 / WEISENBURGH II, William B.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
05 / HOLLAND, Timothy S.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
06 / ASHER, Ryan M.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
07 / MUHLENKAMP, Tylor C.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
08 / BLACK, Brian D.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
09 / DENZINGER, Kristen G.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
10 / BENCHEK, Amy L.
4545 Creek Road
Cincinnati, OH Ohio 45242 / US
 [2019/48]
Representative(s)Bettridge, Paul Sebastian
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[2019/48]
Application number, filing date19185541.017.10.2016
[2019/48]
Priority number, dateUS201562243189P19.10.2015         Original published format: US 201562243189 P
US201662363411P18.07.2016         Original published format: US 201662363411 P
US20161528481904.10.2016         Original published format: US201615284819
[2019/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3572026
Date:27.11.2019
Language:EN
[2019/48]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61B18/14, // A61B17/00, A61B18/00
[2019/48]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/48]
TitleGerman:CHIRUGISCHES INSTRUMENT MIT BIVALENTEM ENDEFFEKTOR UND SEITENGELADENER KLAMMERARMVORRICHTUNG[2019/48]
English:SURGICAL INSTRUMENT WITH DUAL MODE END EFFECTOR AND SIDE-LOADED CLAMP ARM ASSEMBLY[2019/48]
French:INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL AVEC EFFECTEUR BI-MODE ET UN ENSEMBLE BRAS DE PRÉHENSION À CHARGE LATÉRALE[2019/48]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP16784766.4  / EP3364893
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
15.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2015107916  (OLYMPUS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0047] - [0052]; figures 3-9 * [Y] 5;
 [X]EP2589347  (OLYMPUS MEDICAL SYSTEMS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * paragraph [0067]; figures 6,7,10,11,19-27a *;
 [A]US2003199869  (JOHNSON KRISTIN D [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0082] - [0084] - [0102]; figures 4a,4b,8 *;
 [A]US2010331873  (DANNAHER WILLIAM D [US], et al) [A] 1-4 * the whole document *;
 [Y]JP2005176905  (OLYMPUS CORP) [Y] 5 * pages 2-11; figures 7-10 *;
 [A]DE29811977U  (WINTER & IBE OLYMPUS [DE]) [A] 1,5 * paragraphs [0009] , [0011] *;
 [A]EP2436328  (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US]) [A] 1,5 * paragraph [0043]; figures 1-6 *
by applicantUS5322055
 US5873873
 US5980510
 US6325811
 US6773444
 US6783524
 US2006079874
 US2007191713
 US2007282333
 US2008200940
 US2009105750
 US2010069940
 US2011015660
 US2012029546
 US2012112687
 US2012116265
 US2014005701
 US2014114334
 US2011087212
 US2015080925
 US2015148833
 US20100410603