Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP3574929

EP3574929 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING REDUCED PRESSURE AT A PLURALITY OF WOUND SITES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.11.2019
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KCI Licensing, Inc.
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
[2019/49]
Inventor(s)01 / LOCKE, Christopher Brian
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
02 / HALL, Colin
P.O. Box 659508
San Antonio, TX 78265 / US
 [2019/49]
Representative(s)Cordina, Kevin John
Simmons & Simmons LLP
CityPoint
One Ropemaker Street
London EC2Y 9SS / GB
[2019/49]
Application number, filing date19186548.409.11.2011
[2019/49]
Priority number, dateUS201041471810P17.11.2010         Original published format: US 41471810 P
[2019/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3574929
Date:04.12.2019
Language:EN
[2019/49]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.10.2019
ClassificationInternational:A61M1/00, A61M27/00
[2019/49]
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2019/49]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERWALTUNG VON REDUZIERTEM DRUCK AN EINER VIELZAHL VON WUNDSTELLEN[2019/49]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR MANAGING REDUCED PRESSURE AT A PLURALITY OF WOUND SITES[2019/49]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR GÉRER UNE PRESSION RÉDUITE AU NIVEAU D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE SITES DE BLESSURE[2019/49]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP11784903.4  / EP2640436
EP16159093.0  / EP3053608
EP17194474.7  / EP3295971
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
16.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
16.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
16.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
16.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
16.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
20.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
Documents cited:Search[I]WO2008100440  (KCI LICENSING INC [US], et al) [I] 1-11 * page 4, line 1 - page 7, line 27 * * page 15, lines 26-31; figure 1 *;
 [Y]DE102006051223  (ERDMANN ALFONS [DE]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0060] - [0062] * * figure 4 *;
 [A]US2008300578  (FREEDMAN BRETT [US]) [A] 1-11 * paragraph [0031]; figure 2 *;
 [Y]US2010100061  (ODLAND RICK M [US]) [Y] 1-11 * paragraphs [0104] - [0111]; figures 10-13 *