EP3605279 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USER-RELATED MULTI-SCREEN SOLUTION FOR AUGMENTED REALITY FOR USE IN PERFORMING MAINTENANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.04.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 03.01.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road M/S 4D3 P.O.Box 377 Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSIK, Michal HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.; Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 02 /
CHRAPEK, David HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.; Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | 03 /
CHMELAROVA, Katerina HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC.; Mail Stop: 4D3 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ New Jersey 07950 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Lucas, Peter Lawrence, et al LKGlobal UK Ltd. Cambridge House, Henry Street Bath BA1 1BT / GB | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 19187675.4 | 22.07.2019 | [2020/06] | Priority number, date | US201816048673 | 30.07.2018 Original published format: US201816048673 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3605279 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.01.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/0346 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
G06F3/011 (EP);
G09G5/14 (US);
G06F3/012 (EP,US);
G06F3/015 (US);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06F3/04815 (US);
G09G5/34 (US);
G06F2203/04803 (EP);
G09G2340/0464 (US);
G09G2354/00 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/20] |
Former [2020/06] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR BENUTZERBEZOGENE MEHRBILDSCHIRMLÖSUNG FÜR ERWEITERTE REALITÄT ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON WARTUNG | [2020/06] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR USER-RELATED MULTI-SCREEN SOLUTION FOR AUGMENTED REALITY FOR USE IN PERFORMING MAINTENANCE | [2020/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE SOLUTION DE RÉALITÉ AUGMENTÉE À ÉCRANS MULTIPLES LIÉE À UN UTILISATEUR À UTILISER LORS DE LA MAINTENANCE | [2020/06] | Examination procedure | 02.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/20] | 02.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 01.02.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/26] | 22.02.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/26] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2021 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US10013808 (JONES KENNETH MILTON [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 11, line 5 - column 17, line 37; figures 9-12 *; | [Y]US2016154242 (BORDER JOHN N [US]) [Y] 1,2,5-10 * paragraph [0659] * * paragraph [0724] *; | [Y]US2014300532 (KARKKAINEN LEO [FI], et al) [Y] 3,4 * paragraph [0071]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0014] *; | [Y]US2014347390 (POULOS ADAM G [US], et al) [Y] 1,2,5-10 * paragraph [0049] - paragraph [0054] *; | [A]JP2016149735 (COLOPL INC) [A] 1-10 * figures 4-7 * | [Y] - JOERG TRAUB ET AL, "Advanced Display and Visualization Concepts for Image Guided Surgery", JOURNAL OF DISPLAY TECHNOLOGY, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20081201), vol. 4, no. 4, doi:10.1109/JDT.2008.2006510, ISSN 1551-319X, pages 483 - 490, XP011237913 [Y] 1,2,5-10 * page 486, paragraph section B. - page 489, column left, paragraph second; figures 3-7 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/JDT.2008.2006510 |