blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3604699

EP3604699 - CONNECTING ASSEMBLY FOR HYDRAULIC-SANITARY UTILITIES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.12.2020
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip11.12.2020Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.01.2021  [2021/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NUPI INDUSTRIE ITALIANE S.p.A.
Via Stefano Ferrario 8
21052 Busto Arsizio (VA) / IT
[2020/06]
Inventor(s)01 / GENONI, Marco
Via Sempione, 21/96
20020 ARESE (MI) / IT
02 / GIANI, Nicola Achille
Via Aspesi, 68
21017 SAMARATE (VA) / IT
 [2020/06]
Representative(s)Branca, Emanuela
Barzanò & Zanardo S.p.A.
Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [2020/06]Branca, Emanuela
Barzanò & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo, 10
20121 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date19187999.824.07.2019
[2020/06]
Priority number, dateIT2018000782203.08.2018         Original published format: IT201800007822
[2020/06]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3604699
Date:05.02.2020
Language:EN
[2020/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.01.2020
ClassificationIPC:E03C1/02, F24D3/10
[2020/06]
CPC:
E03C1/021 (EP); F16L41/03 (US); F16L37/08 (US);
F24D3/1066 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/06]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBINDENDE BAUGRUPPE FÜR HYDRAULISCH-SANITÄRE INSTALLATIONENASS[2020/06]
English:CONNECTING ASSEMBLY FOR HYDRAULIC-SANITARY UTILITIES[2020/06]
French:ASSEMBLAGE CONNECTANT POUR DES INSTALLATIONS HYDRAULIQUES-SANITAIRES[2020/06]
Examination procedure06.08.2020Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2021/02]
26.08.2020Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [2021/02]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XYI]DE2812698  (BORGMANN LUDGER) [X] 1,8-10 * the whole document * [Y] 8 [I] 2-7;
 [XI]EP0071870  (MAILE & GRAMMER GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,9,10 * the whole document * [I] 2-8;
 [Y]DE202016107042U  (REHAU AG & CO [DE]) [Y] 8 * paragraph [0010] *;
 [A]EP1099896  (GEORG FISCHER HAUSTECHNIK AG [CH]) [A] 1 * the whole document *
by applicantIT1290251
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.