blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3769651

EP3769651 - DOMESTIC KITCHEN APPLIANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.12.2022
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  14.01.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  28.09.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  21.05.2021
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  25.12.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.06.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.07.2024  [2024/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vorwerk & Co. Interholding GmbH
Mühlenweg 17-37
42270 Wuppertal / DE
[2021/04]
Inventor(s)01 / Ortmann, Dr., Roman
Finkenstraße 62
47057 Duisburg / DE
02 / Isenberg, Gerhard
Wörthstraße 32
50668 Köln / DE
03 / Thutewohl, Sarah
Abteistraße 73
44287 Dortmund / DE
04 / Möller, Samuel
Up de Ahuus 1
48291 Telgte / DE
 [2021/04]
Representative(s)Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte
Brucknerstraße 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
[2022/07]
Former [2021/04]Gille Hrabal
Brucknerstrasse 20
40593 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date19188122.624.07.2019
[2021/04]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3769651
Date:27.01.2021
Language:DE
[2021/04]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3769651
Date:16.02.2022
Language:DE
[2022/07]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.12.2019
ClassificationIPC:A47J43/07
[2021/04]
CPC:
A47J43/07 (EP); A47J2043/0733 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/25]
Former [2021/04]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:HAUSHALTSKÜCHENMASCHINE[2021/04]
English:DOMESTIC KITCHEN APPLIANCE[2021/04]
French:ROBOT MÉNAGER[2021/04]
Examination procedure11.05.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2021Examination requested  [2021/25]
19.05.2021Date on which the examining division has become responsible
29.09.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2022Fee for grant paid
04.01.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.01.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)17.11.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2023/04]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.07.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU24.07.2019
AL16.02.2022
CY16.02.2022
CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
MC16.02.2022
MK16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SI16.02.2022
SK16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
TR16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
IE24.07.2022
LU24.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
[2024/29]
Former [2024/25]HU24.07.2019
AL16.02.2022
CY16.02.2022
CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
MC16.02.2022
MK16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SI16.02.2022
SK16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
IE24.07.2022
LU24.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
Former [2024/23]AL16.02.2022
CY16.02.2022
CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
MC16.02.2022
MK16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SI16.02.2022
SK16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
IE24.07.2022
LU24.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
Former [2024/20]AL16.02.2022
CY16.02.2022
CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
MC16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SI16.02.2022
SK16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
IE24.07.2022
LU24.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
Former [2023/33]AL16.02.2022
CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
MC16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SI16.02.2022
SK16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
IE24.07.2022
LU24.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
Former [2023/26]AL16.02.2022
CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
MC16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SI16.02.2022
SK16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
LU24.07.2022
BE31.07.2022
Former [2023/21]AL16.02.2022
CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
MC16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SI16.02.2022
SK16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
LU24.07.2022
Former [2023/11]AL16.02.2022
CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
MC16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SI16.02.2022
SK16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
Former [2023/10]AL16.02.2022
CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SI16.02.2022
SK16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
Former [2023/01]AL16.02.2022
CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SK16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
Former [2022/49]CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SK16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
Former [2022/48]CZ16.02.2022
DK16.02.2022
EE16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
Former [2022/47]DK16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RO16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
SM16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
Former [2022/46]DK16.02.2022
FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
Former [2022/42]FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
IS17.06.2022
Former [2022/39]FI16.02.2022
HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
Former [2022/36]HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
LV16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
GR17.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
Former [2022/35]HR16.02.2022
LT16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
RS16.02.2022
SE16.02.2022
BG16.05.2022
NO16.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
Former [2022/34]LT16.02.2022
NL16.02.2022
NO16.05.2022
PT16.06.2022
Former [2022/33]LT16.02.2022
NO16.05.2022
Documents cited:Search[XAY]DE102016219972  (BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,8,9 * paragraphs [0026] - [0032] - [0 35] - [0039]; figure - * [A] 10 [Y] 2,7;
 [YA]EP3420864  (VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]) [Y] 2,7 * paragraphs [0009] - [0011] - [0 14]; figures 1, 3 *[A] 1,9
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.