EP3640912 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR WIRELESS ROAD SIDE UNITS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.11.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.10.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 20.03.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | [2020/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUCKLEY, Adrian C/O 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 02 /
MONTEMURRO, Michael Peter C/O 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | 03 /
McCANN, Stephen C/O 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, Ontario N2K 0A7 / CA | [2020/17] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25/26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 19199398.9 | 24.09.2019 | [2020/17] | Priority number, date | US201816165385 | 19.10.2018 Original published format: US201816165385 | [2020/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3640912 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01, H04W4/44, H04W88/06 | [2020/17] | CPC: |
H04W4/44 (EP);
G08G1/096783 (US);
G08G1/0112 (EP);
H04L67/12 (US);
H04W84/005 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/48] |
Former [2020/17] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR DRAHTLOSE STRASSENSEITIGE EINHEITEN | [2020/17] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR WIRELESS ROAD SIDE UNITS | [2020/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR UNITÉS CÔTÉ ROUTE SANS FIL | [2020/17] | Examination procedure | 16.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.10.2020 | Examination requested [2020/48] | 16.10.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.03.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO2011025809 (TELCORDIA TECH INC [US], et al); | [XI]WO2017164838 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]); | [I]WO2017189035 (INTEL IP CORP [US]); | [XI]US2017324817 (OLIVEIRA PATRICIA [PT], et al) |