blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3648494

EP3648494 - ACTIVATION FOR NEAR-FIELD COMMUNICATION DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  18.09.2020
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  01.05.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip28.10.2023New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Yubico AB
Kungsgatan 44, 2nd Floor
11135 Stockholm / SE
[2021/01]
Former [2020/19]For all designated states
YUBICO AB
Olof Palmes gata 11, 6th Floor
11137 Stockholm / SE
Inventor(s)01 / Johansson, Jesper Mikael
c/o Yubico AB
Kungsgatan 44, 2nd Floor
11135 Stockholm / SE
02 / Harrell, Christopher
c/o Yubico AB
Kungsgatan 44, 2nd Floor
11135 Stockholm / SE
 [2021/01]
Former [2020/19]01 / Johansson, Jesper Mikael
c/o Yubico AB
Olof Palmes gata 11
6th Floor
11137 Stockholm / SE
02 / Harrell, Christopher
c/o Yubico AB
Olof Palmes gata 11
6th Floor
11137 Stockholm / SE
Representative(s)Zahn, Matthias, et al
Peter Bittner und Partner
Herrenwiesenweg 2
69207 Sandhausen / DE
[2020/19]
Application number, filing date19201012.202.10.2019
[2020/19]
Priority number, dateUS20181617568930.10.2018         Original published format: US201816175689
[2020/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3648494
Date:06.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.12.2019
ClassificationIPC:H04W12/08, H04W4/80, H04L29/06
[2020/19]
CPC:
H04W12/08 (EP); G06K19/07345 (AU); G06K7/10247 (US);
G06F21/44 (EP,US); G06F21/74 (EP); G06K19/0727 (AU);
G06K19/07372 (AU); G06K7/10297 (EP); H04B5/22 (US);
H04B5/72 (EP,US); H04L63/0492 (EP); H04W4/80 (EP,AU);
H04W12/06 (AU) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/23]
Former [2020/19]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:AKTIVIERUNG FÜR EINE NAHFELDKOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG[2020/19]
English:ACTIVATION FOR NEAR-FIELD COMMUNICATION DEVICE[2020/19]
French:ACTIVATION POUR DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION EN CHAMP PROCHE[2020/19]
Examination procedure29.04.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.04.2020Examination requested  [2020/23]
29.04.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
17.09.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
08.12.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.07.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.04.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.08.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
27.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
27.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2013068835  (ZANZOT MARK D [US], et al) [A] 2,10,15 * figures 2A-2C ** paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0038] *;
 [XI]US2016290838  (MUDIREDDY CHANDRASEKAR REDDY [IN], et al) [X] 14,15 * figures 1, 4-6 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0046] * [I] 1-13;
 [IA]US9800570  (BLEISCH N DAVID [US]) [I] 1-5,9-11,14,15 * figures 1-3 * * claims 10-12, 16-18 * * column 3, line 37 - line 48 * * column 4, line 63 - line 67 * * column 5, line 1 - line 6 * * column 7, line 11 - line 12 * * column 7, line 60 - line 67 * * column 8, line 1 - line 12 * * column 8, line 32 - line 36 * * column 8, line 62 - line 64 * * column 9, line 3 - line 10 * * column 9, line 38 - line 47 * * column 11, line 7 - line 14 * * column 12, line 7 - line 23 * * column 12, line 52 - line 57 * * column 13, line 4 - line 14 * * column 13, line 42 - line 53 * * column 14, line 50 - line 60 * * column 15, line 47 - line 67 * * column 16, line 1 - line 3 * [A] 6-8,12,13
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.