blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3660831

EP3660831 - COMPUTER SYSTEM, DISPLAY APPARATUS, AND DISPLAY METHOD OF ON-SCREEN-DISPLAY INTERFACE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  22.07.2022
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  02.04.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.12.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip22.07.2022Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 24.08.2022  [2022/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd.
No. 6, Bao Chiang Rd.
Hsin-Tien Dist.
New Taipei City 231 / TW
[N/P]
Former [2020/23]For all designated states
Giga-Byte Technology Co., Ltd.
No. 6, Bao Chiang Rd
Hsin-Tien Dist.
New Taipei City 231 / TW
Inventor(s)01 / Chen, Wu-Chuan
No. 6, Bau Chiang Rd.
Hsin-Tien Dist.
231 New Taipei City / TW
02 / Chang, Shih-Pin
No. 6, Bau Chiang Rd.
Hsin-Tien Dist.
231 New Taipei City / TW
03 / Liou, Yu-Cheng
No. 6, Bau Chiang Rd.
Hsin-Tien Dist.
231 New Taipei City / TW
04 / Liu, Chia-En
No. 6, Bau Chiang Rd.
Hsin-Tien Dist.
231 New Taipei City / TW
 [2020/23]
Representative(s)Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Kaistraße 16A
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2020/23]Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Speditionstraße 21
40221 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date19201478.504.10.2019
[2020/23]
Priority number, dateTW2018014217027.11.2018         Original published format: TW 107142170
[2020/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3660831
Date:03.06.2020
Language:EN
[2020/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:G09G5/14, H04N5/445
[2020/23]
CPC:
G09G5/14 (EP); G06F3/14 (CN,KR,US); G06F1/1601 (KR);
G06F13/102 (US); G06F13/14 (KR); G06F3/0484 (KR);
H04N21/4312 (EP); H04N21/4316 (EP); G01S5/18 (US);
H04N5/44504 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/02]
Former [2020/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:COMPUTERSYSTEM, ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG UND ANZEIGEVERFAHREN FÜR EINE BILDSCHIRMANZEIGESCHNITTSTELLE[2020/23]
English:COMPUTER SYSTEM, DISPLAY APPARATUS, AND DISPLAY METHOD OF ON-SCREEN-DISPLAY INTERFACE[2020/23]
French:SYSTÈME INFORMATIQUE, APPAREIL D'AFFICHAGE ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'INTERFACE D'AFFICHAGE SUR ÉCRAN[2020/23]
Examination procedure03.12.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2020Examination requested  [2021/02]
03.12.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
05.04.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.07.2022Application withdrawn by applicant  [2022/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.09.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US2009241051  (LI CHEN-PANG [TW], et al) [X] 12 * abstract * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0020] * [I] 1-11,13-15;
 [A]US2014198193  (YAMAMOTO MASAAKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.