blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3647919

EP3647919 - TOUCH SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  01.07.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  03.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.10.2023New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Display Co., Ltd.
1, Samsung-ro
Giheung-gu
Yongin-si
Gyeonggi-do 17113 / KR
[2020/19]
Inventor(s)01 / KIM, Ga Young
D-3401, 200, Dongtanjungang-ro, Hwaseong-si
Gyeonggi-Do / KR
02 / KIM, Jang Hui
905-1302, 23, Bongyeong-ro 1517beon-gil
Yeongtong-gu, Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-Do / KR
03 / JO, A Ra
2F, 27, Jinheung-ro 15-gil, Eunpyeong-gu
Seoul / KR
 [2020/19]
Representative(s)Taor, Simon Edward William, et al
Venner Shipley LLP
200 Aldersgate
London EC1A 4HD / GB
[2020/19]
Application number, filing date19202843.911.10.2019
[2020/19]
Priority number, dateKR2018012235815.10.2018         Original published format: KR 20180122358
[2020/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP3647919
Date:06.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP3647919
Date:29.07.2020
Language:EN
[2020/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP25.06.2020
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/041, G06F3/044
[2020/19]
CPC:
G06F3/0443 (EP,US); G06F3/0414 (KR,US); G06F3/045 (CN,KR,US);
G06F3/0412 (CN,US); G06F3/0416 (KR,US); G06F3/044 (KR,US);
G06F3/0446 (EP,US); H10K59/131 (KR); H10K59/40 (KR);
H10K59/873 (KR); H10K77/10 (KR); G06F2203/04105 (EP,US);
G06F2203/04106 (EP,US); G06F2203/04111 (KR,US); G06F2203/04113 (CN,US);
G06F3/04144 (US); G06F3/04164 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/19]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BERÜHRUNGSSENSOR[2020/19]
English:TOUCH SENSOR[2020/19]
French:CAPTEUR TACTILE[2020/19]
Examination procedure30.03.2020Examination requested  [2020/19]
29.01.2021Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.11.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
18.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
17.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2525174  (NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY [FI]) [A] 1-17 * page 13, line 1 - page 14, line 10; figures 1, 3b *;
 [XYI]US2016195955  (PICCIOTTO CARL E [US], et al) [X] 1,3,5,6,13,15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0056]; figures 2-8 * [Y] 2,14 [I] 4,7-12,16,17;
 [A]US2017010719  (CHEN FENG [CN], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0035]; figures 3, 12 *;
 [A]US2017220180  (LU FENG [CN], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0040] *;
 [A]US2017371471  (KIM MIN SOO [KR], et al) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0190] - paragraph [0210]; figures 11, 12, 13, 15 *;
 [YA]EP3324277  (HIDEEP INC [KR]) [Y] 2,14 * paragraph [0029]; figure 7j * [A] 1,13;
 [A]US2018224984  (KIM DO IK [KR], et al) [A] 1-17* paragraph [0096] - paragraph [0121]; figures 5-15B *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.