blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3648111

EP3648111 - ELECTRONIC CLINICAL CASE REPORTING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.06.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  06.11.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.10.2023New entry: Reply to examination report 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CRF Box Oy
Fredrikinkatu 42
00100 Helsinki / FI
[2020/19]
Inventor(s)01 / Lehtomäki, Riku
CRF Box Oy
Fredrikinkatu 42
00100 Helsinki / FI
02 / Haaman, Ari
CRF Box Oy
Fredrikinkatu 42
00100 Helsinki / FI
03 / Huminiuc, Mihai
CRF Box Oy
Fredrikinkatu 42
00100 Helsinki / FI
04 / Patras, Silviu
CRF Box Oy
Fredrikinkatu 42
00100 Helsinki / FI
 [2020/19]
Representative(s)Espatent Oy
Kaivokatu 10 D
00100 Helsinki / FI
[N/P]
Former [2020/19]Espatent Oy
Kaivokatu 10 D
00100 Helsinki / FI
Application number, filing date19203454.416.10.2019
[2020/19]
Priority number, dateFI2018000591831.10.2018         Original published format: FI 20185918
[2020/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3648111
Date:06.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2020
ClassificationIPC:G16H10/20
[2020/19]
CPC:
G16H10/20 (EP,FI,US); G06F3/04886 (US); A61B5/14532 (US);
G06F21/629 (FI); G06F3/0238 (US); G06F9/451 (FI,US);
G16H10/40 (US); G16H10/60 (US); G16H15/00 (EP);
G16H40/63 (EP); H04M1/72403 (US); H04M1/724634 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/50]
Former [2020/19]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHE KLINISCHE FALLBERICHTERSTATTUNG[2020/19]
English:ELECTRONIC CLINICAL CASE REPORTING[2020/19]
French:RAPPORTS DE CAS CLINIQUES ÉLECTRONIQUES[2020/19]
Examination procedure29.10.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.10.2020Examination requested  [2020/50]
29.10.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.06.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
13.10.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US2003016243  (KORALA ARAVINDA [GB]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0047] - [0073] *;
 [A]US2014005809  (FREI RANDALL W [US], et al) [A] 1,13* paragraphs [0067] - [0360] *;
 [I]EP2778908  (BLACKBERRY LTD [CA]) [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] - [0046] *;
 [Y]  - Anonymous, "KioWare for Android", (20181027), URL: https://www.kioware.com/docs.aspx?u=introduction.html&p=1&v=4.9.6&t=5, (20200304), XP055673736 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [Y]  - Anonymous, "KioWare Server 4.9.6", (20170101), URL: https://www.kioware.com/docs.aspx?u=introduction.html&p=1&v=4.9.6&t=5, (20200304), XP055673786 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *
 [A]  - James Kruper, "What is "Kiosk mode"?", (20140201), URL: https://www.kioware.com/resources.aspx?resID=45, (20200304), XP055673657 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.