blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3647198

EP3647198 - AIRCRAFT REFRIGERATION SYSTEM WITH A MOTOR-ASSISTED CABIN AIR TURBINE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.04.2023
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  13.05.2022
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  08.02.2022
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  19.03.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.11.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  03.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.04.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 22.05.2024  [2024/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
[2022/24]
Former [2020/19]For all designated states
Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Hennig, Oliver
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
02 / Klimpel, Frank
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
03 / Everth, Henning
c/o Airbus Operations GmbH
Kreetslag 10
21129 Hamburg / DE
 [2020/19]
Representative(s)(deleted)
[2022/24]
Former [2020/19]Schornack, Oliver
Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff
Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Schweigerstraße 2
81541 München / DE
Application number, filing date19204472.522.10.2019
[2020/19]
Priority number, dateDE20181012692129.10.2018         Original published format: DE102018126921
[2020/19]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3647198
Date:06.05.2020
Language:DE
[2020/19]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3647198
Date:15.06.2022
Language:DE
[2022/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.03.2020
ClassificationIPC:B64D13/02, B64D13/06
[2020/19]
CPC:
B64D13/02 (EP); B64D13/06 (EP,CN); B64D13/08 (EP,CN,US);
B64D13/006 (US); B64D33/02 (US); B64D33/04 (EP,US);
B64D2013/0603 (CN); B64D2013/0611 (US); B64D2013/0618 (EP,US);
B64D2013/0648 (EP); B64D2013/0688 (EP,CN,US); Y02T50/40 (EP);
Y02T50/50 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/51]
Former [2020/19]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:FLUGZEUGKÄLTEANLAGE MIT EINER MOTOR-UNTERSTÜTZTEN KABINENABLUFTTURBINE[2020/19]
English:AIRCRAFT REFRIGERATION SYSTEM WITH A MOTOR-ASSISTED CABIN AIR TURBINE[2020/19]
French:INSTALLATION FRIGORIFIQUE D'AVION DOTÉE D'UNE TURBINE D'AIR ÉVACUÉ DE LA CABINE SUPPORTÉE PAR MOTEUR[2020/19]
Examination procedure04.11.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
06.11.2020Examination requested  [2020/51]
06.11.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.03.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.07.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.02.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.2022Fee for grant paid
09.05.2022Fee for publishing/printing paid
09.05.2022Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)16.03.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2023/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.10.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU22.10.2019
AL15.06.2022
CY15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
IT15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
IE22.10.2022
LU22.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
[2024/21]
Former [2024/18]HU22.10.2019
AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
IT15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
IE22.10.2022
LU22.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2024/11]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
IT15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
IE22.10.2022
LU22.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/48]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
IE22.10.2022
LU22.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/42]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
LU22.10.2022
BE31.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/35]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
LU22.10.2022
CH31.10.2022
LI31.10.2022
Former [2023/30]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
LU22.10.2022
Former [2023/25]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
MC15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SI15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/21]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
DK15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/17]AL15.06.2022
CZ15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/12]CZ15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
IS15.10.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/11]CZ15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
PL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/09]CZ15.06.2022
EE15.06.2022
ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
RO15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
SK15.06.2022
SM15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
PT17.10.2022
Former [2023/08]ES15.06.2022
FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
Former [2023/02]FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
NL15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
Former [2022/50]FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
RS15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
Former [2022/49]FI15.06.2022
HR15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
LV15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
BG15.09.2022
NO15.09.2022
GR16.09.2022
Former [2022/47]FI15.06.2022
LT15.06.2022
SE15.06.2022
NO15.09.2022
Documents cited:Search[XY]US4312191  (BIAGINI GUIDO) [X] 1,2,4-15 * column 4, line 41 - column 13, line 29 * [Y] 3;
 [XY]US6058715  (STRANG JAMES E [US], et al) [X] 1,4-15 * column 1, line 59 - column 4, line 8 * [Y] 3;
 [Y]WO2017168074  (SAFRAN POWER UNITS [FR]) [Y] 3* paragraph [0086] - paragraph [0087] *;
 [XP]EP3543130  (BOEING CO [US]) [XP] 1 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0022] *
ExaminationEP0888966
by applicantEP2735510
 US2014144163
 DE102015222193
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.