blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3650797

EP3650797 - DEVICE FOR EXTRACORPOREAL TEMPERING OF PATIENTS WITH A SEPARABLE SECONDARY BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.04.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.02.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  11.10.2022
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  25.12.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  20.11.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  10.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip10.04.2024New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lauda Dr. R. Wobser GmbH & Co. KG
Laudaplatz 1
97922 Lauda-Königshofen / DE
[2021/48]
Former [2020/20]For all designated states
Lauda Dr. R. Wobser GmbH & Co. KG
Pfarrstrasse 41/43
97922 Lauda-Königshofen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Braun, Kristofer
Pförtlesweg 5
97980 Bad Mergentheim / DE
 [2020/20]
Representative(s)Zimmermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 330 920
80069 München / DE
[2020/20]
Application number, filing date19207150.405.11.2019
[2020/20]
Priority number, dateDE20181012810209.11.2018         Original published format: DE102018128102
[2020/20]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3650797
Date:13.05.2020
Language:DE
[2020/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.03.2020
ClassificationIPC:F28D9/00, F28F3/08, F28F3/12, F28F13/12, A61M1/36
[2020/20]
CPC:
F28D9/0037 (EP); A61M1/1601 (CN); A61F7/0085 (US);
A61M1/1621 (CN); A61M1/1698 (EP,CN); A61M1/3612 (CN);
A61M1/3621 (CN); A61M1/3623 (EP,CN,US); A61M1/369 (EP,CN);
F28F13/12 (EP); F28F3/083 (EP); F28F3/12 (EP);
A61F2007/0069 (US); A61M2202/0413 (CN); A61M2205/36 (CN);
A61M2205/366 (EP); F28D2021/005 (EP) (-)
C-Set:
A61M2202/0413, A61M2202/0021 (CN)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/52]
Former [2020/20]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VORRICHTUNG ZUR EXTRAKORPORALEN TEMPERIERUNG VON PATIENTEN MIT EINEM TRENNBAREN SEKUNDÄRKÖRPER[2020/20]
English:DEVICE FOR EXTRACORPOREAL TEMPERING OF PATIENTS WITH A SEPARABLE SECONDARY BODY[2020/20]
French:DISPOSITIF DE THERMORÉGULATION EXTRACORPORALE DE PATIENTS COMPRENANT UN SECOND CORPS SÉPARABLE[2020/20]
Examination procedure13.11.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.11.2020Examination requested  [2020/52]
13.11.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
13.01.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.04.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.09.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.12.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.02.2023Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
24.02.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.06.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
29.09.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
10.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XAY]US4156459  (KUSUDA HISAO [JP], et al) [X] 1-6,8-13 * the whole document * [A] 14,15 [Y] 7;
 [A]US2009235686  (KIKUCHI YOSHIHARU [JP]) [A] 1-13 * figure 2 *;
 [X]US2009255655  (MARTIN DANIEL [BE], et al) [X] 1 * figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2015230975  (DABROWIAK JEREMY THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 7 * paragraph [0050]; figures 2,4 *;
 [A]US2018207027  (DILLER KENNETH R [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.