blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3656993

EP3656993 - METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING A LOADED COMBUSTION ENGINE IN TERMS OF A LEAKAGE IN A SECTION OF THE FRESH GAS SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  25.03.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  23.09.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.12.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  24.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.03.2024New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
VOLKSWAGEN AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Berliner Ring 2
38440 Wolfsburg / DE
[2020/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Hauptvogel, Mathias
Oebisfelder Straße 9
39356 Weferlingen / DE
02 / Berski, Fabian
Wittekamp 24
30163 Hannover / DE
 [2020/22]
Application number, filing date19207768.307.11.2019
[2020/22]
Priority number, dateDE20181021997021.11.2018         Original published format: DE102018219970
[2020/22]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3656993
Date:27.05.2020
Language:DE
[2020/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2020
ClassificationIPC:F02B33/34, F02B37/16, F02D41/00, F02D41/22, F02M35/10, F02D23/00, F02D9/02
[2020/22]
CPC:
F02D41/22 (EP,CN); G01M3/025 (US); F02B33/40 (EP);
F02B37/00 (US); F02B37/24 (EP); F02D23/00 (EP);
F02D41/0007 (EP); F02D9/02 (EP); F02M26/06 (EP,CN);
F02M26/49 (CN); F02M35/10255 (CN); G01M3/26 (US);
F02B2039/168 (EP); F02D2200/0404 (EP); F02M35/1038 (EP);
Y02T10/12 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/01]
Former [2020/22]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSE EINER AUFGELADENEN BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE HINSICHTLICH EINER LECKAGE IN EINEM ABSCHNITT DES FRISCHGASSTRANGS[2020/22]
English:METHOD FOR DIAGNOSING A LOADED COMBUSTION ENGINE IN TERMS OF A LEAKAGE IN A SECTION OF THE FRESH GAS SECTION[2020/22]
French:PROCÉDÉ DE DIAGNOSTIC D'UN MOTEUR À COMBUSTION INTERNE CHARGÉ CONCERNANT UNE FUITE DANS UNE SECTION DU CONDUIT DE GAZ FRAIS[2020/22]
Examination procedure17.07.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.11.2020Examination requested  [2021/01]
27.11.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
22.09.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.01.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2024Communication of intention to grant the patent
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE10300592  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figure 1; claims 1-10 *;
 [I]DE102004036064  (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [I] 1-9 * paragraphs [0007] - [0013] - [0 29] - [0046]; figures 1-7; claims 1-20 *;
 [Y]WO2009150057  (CONTINENTAL AUTOMOTIVE GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-9 * page 6, lines 9-14; figures 1-3; claims 1-11 * * page 2, lines 13-22 * * page 23, line 11 - page 24, line 9 *;
 [A]FR2985544  (RENAULT SA [FR]) [A] 1-9 * page 2, lines 20,21; figure 1; claim 1 * * page 9, line 23 - page 10, line 19 *;
 [A]DE102013218612  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0032] - [0036]; figure 1; claims 1-8 *;
 [A]US2017328810  (YAEO TORU [JP]) [A] 1* paragraphs [0101] , [0102]; figures 1-7; claims 1-5 *;
 [A]DE102016217921  (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claims 1,2 *;
 [Y]WO2018131152  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0040] - [0051]; figures 1-3; claim 1 *;
 EP3569847  [ ] (NISSAN MOTOR [JP], et al)
by applicantDE102005024984
 DE102005060350
 DE102015202180
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.