blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3637223

EP3637223 - USER TERMINAL DEVICE AND DISPLAYING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  23.02.2024
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  21.11.2023
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  05.11.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  13.03.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip23.02.2024(Expected) grantpublished on 27.03.2024  [2024/13]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2020/16]
Inventor(s)01 / KANG, Dong-goo
101, 80, Bangbae-ro 28-gil, Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-836 / KR
02 / KIM, Yun-Kyung
104-1104, 22, Haryul-ro 30beon-gil, Jangan-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 440-725 / KR
03 / LEE, Yong-yeon
146-202 498 Yeongtong-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-740 / KR
04 / KWAK, Ji-yeon
105-602, 29, Baumoe-ro 7-gil
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-781 / KR
05 / PARK, Hae-yoon
A-101, 117-3, Yangjaecheon-ro
Seocho-gu
Seoul 137-890 / KR
 [2020/16]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2020/16]
Application number, filing date19208930.809.02.2015
[2020/16]
Priority number, dateUS201461937744P10.02.2014         Original published format: US 201461937744 P
KR2014013488607.10.2014         Original published format: KR 20140134886
[2020/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3637223
Date:15.04.2020
Language:EN
[2020/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3637223
Date:27.03.2024
Language:EN
[2024/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.03.2020
ClassificationIPC:G06F3/04886, G06F3/0487, G06F1/16, G06F3/04883, G06F3/0482, H04M1/02, H04M1/67, H04M1/72403, H04M1/72469, H04M1/725, G06F9/44, G06F9/451, G11B27/34
[2023/50]
CPC:
G06F3/0482 (EP,RU,US); G06F3/01 (KR); G06F3/04817 (US);
G06F1/1641 (EP,US); G06F1/1652 (EP,RU,US); G06F1/1677 (EP,US);
G06F1/1694 (EP,RU,US); G06F3/048 (KR); G06F3/04842 (US);
G06F3/0487 (EP,RU,US); G06F3/0488 (US); G06F3/04883 (EP,US);
G06F3/04886 (EP,US); G06F3/147 (KR); G06F9/451 (EP,US);
G11B27/34 (EP,US); H04M1/0214 (EP,US); H04M1/0243 (EP,US);
H04M1/0245 (EP,US); H04M1/67 (EP); H04M1/72403 (EP,RU,US);
H04M1/72469 (EP,US); G06F2200/1637 (EP,US); G06F2203/04803 (EP,US);
H04M2250/16 (EP,US); H04M2250/22 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2020/16]G06F1/16, G06F3/0488, G06F3/0487, G06F3/0482, G06F9/44, G06F9/451, H04M1/02, H04M1/725, G11B27/34
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/16]  
TitleGerman:BENUTZERENDGERÄTEVORRICHTUNG UND ANZEIGEVERFAHREN DAFÜR[2020/16]
English:USER TERMINAL DEVICE AND DISPLAYING METHOD THEREOF[2020/16]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TERMINAL D'UTILISATEUR ET SON PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE[2020/16]
Examination procedure13.11.2019Examination requested  [2020/16]
10.07.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
09.11.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.11.2023Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 22.11.2023
22.11.2023Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.11.2023Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
29.01.2024Fee for grant paid
29.01.2024Fee for publishing/printing paid
29.01.2024Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15745916.5  / EP3105656
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
13.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
13.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
25.02.2020Renewal fee patent year 06
09.02.2021Renewal fee patent year 07
23.02.2022Renewal fee patent year 08
23.02.2023Renewal fee patent year 09
21.02.2024Renewal fee patent year 10
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US2008158795  (AOKI PAUL M [US], et al) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0017]; figure 3 *;
 [Y]JP2009124449  (NTT DOCOMO INC) [Y] 1-12 * figures 1-8 * * paragraphs [0034] , [0 40] - [0050] *;
 [Y]WO2012160674  (FUJITSU LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 1-12 * figures 10, 21-24 * * paragraphs [0016] , [0 17] , [0 42] * * paragraphs [0101] - [0120] *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.