blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3660747

EP3660747 - BIT INTERPRETATION FOR CONVOLUTIONAL NEURAL NETWORK INPUT LAYER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  14.05.2021
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  11.12.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.01.2025New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Bosch GmbH
Postfach 30 02 20
70442 Stuttgart / DE
[2020/23]
Inventor(s)01 / Rocznik, Thomas
1617 Begen Avenue
Mountain View, California 94040 / US
02 / Duerichen, Robert
89 Frenchay Road
Oxford, OX2 6TF / GB
03 / Peters, Christian
1773 B Lattham St.
Mountain View, California 94041 / US
 [2020/23]
Representative(s)Isarpatent
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Barth
Charles Hassa Peckmann & Partner mbB
Friedrichstrasse 31
80801 München / DE
[N/P]
Application number, filing date19209227.814.11.2019
[2020/23]
Priority number, dateUS20181620662230.11.2018         Original published format: US201816206622
[2020/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3660747
Date:03.06.2020
Language:EN
[2020/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:G06N3/04, G06N3/063
[2020/23]
CPC:
G06N3/063 (EP,CN); G06N3/04 (KR,US); G06N3/045 (EP,CN);
G06N3/08 (KR,US); G06N3/044 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/02]
Former [2020/23]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:BIT-INTERPRETATION FÜR EINE EINGABESCHICHT EINES NEURONALEN KONVOLUTIONSNETZWERKS[2020/23]
English:BIT INTERPRETATION FOR CONVOLUTIONAL NEURAL NETWORK INPUT LAYER[2020/23]
French:INTERPRÉTATION DE BITS POUR COUCHE D'ENTRÉE DE RÉSEAU NEURONAL CONVOLUTIONNEL[2020/23]
Examination procedure01.12.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2020Examination requested  [2021/02]
03.12.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
14.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.09.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.07.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.10.2023Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.01.2025Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.01.2025
13.01.2025Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
20.01.2025Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
30.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
30.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
02.12.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XI]US10089577  (UMUROGLU YAMAN [IE], et al);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.