blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3657444

EP3657444 - TOMOGRAPHIC IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  26.11.2021
Database last updated on 18.05.2024
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.08.2020
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  24.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip26.11.2021Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.12.2021  [2021/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si
Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR
[2020/22]
Inventor(s)01 / Choi, Yuna
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
02 / Lee, Changlae
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
03 / Choi, Jiyoung
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
04 / Jung, Jinwook
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
05 / Hong, Keyjo
129, Samsung-ro, Yeongtong-gu
16677 Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do / KR
 [2020/22]
Representative(s)Gulde & Partner
Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB
Wallstraße 58/59
10179 Berlin / DE
[2020/22]
Application number, filing date19210916.322.11.2019
[2020/22]
Priority number, dateKR2018014677423.11.2018         Original published format: KR 20180146774
[2020/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3657444
Date:27.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/22]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.02.2020
ClassificationIPC:G06T11/00
[2020/22]
CPC:
G06T11/008 (EP); A61B6/5205 (KR,US); A61B6/463 (US);
A61B6/032 (KR,US); A61B6/461 (US); A61B6/501 (US);
A61B6/5217 (KR); A61B6/54 (KR); A61B6/583 (US);
G06T7/0012 (US); G06T2200/24 (EP); G06T2207/10081 (US);
G06T2207/20072 (US); G06T2207/20076 (US); G06T2207/20081 (US);
G06T2207/20084 (US); G06T2207/20104 (US); G06T2207/30096 (US);
G06T2211/408 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/22]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:TOMOGRAPHIEBILDVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN SOWIE COMPUTERPROGRAMMPRODUKT[2020/22]
English:TOMOGRAPHIC IMAGE PROCESSING APPARATUS AND METHOD, AND COMPUTER PROGRAM PRODUCT[2020/22]
French:APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'IMAGE TOMOGRAPHIQUE ET PRODUIT-PROGRAMME D'ORDINATEUR[2020/22]
Examination procedure22.11.2019Examination requested  [2020/22]
26.06.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.08.2020Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03)
10.11.2020Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.05.2021Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/52]
20.05.2021Date of oral proceedings
05.07.2021Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.08.2021Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/52]
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XY]WO2018098118  (MAYO FOUND MEDICAL EDUCATION & RES [US]) [X] 1-5,10-15 * figures 1, 2, 3, 5, 6, 8, 9 * * paragraphs [0027] , [0 46] , [0 47] , [0 30] , [0 31] , [0 67] * [Y] 6-9;
 [Y]  - CLARK D P ET AL, "Multi-energy CT decomposition using convolutional neural networks", PROGRESS IN BIOMEDICAL OPTICS AND IMAGING, SPIE - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, BELLINGHAM, WA, US, (20180309), vol. 10573, doi:10.1117/12.2293728, ISSN 1605-7422, ISBN 978-1-5106-0027-0, pages 105731O - 105731O, XP060104907 [Y] 6-9 * sec. 2.2, "cnn-based material decomposition" * * figure 1 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2293728
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.