EP3686272 - ORGANISMS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF 1,3-BUTANEDIOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.06.2021 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 26.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2021 [2021/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genomatica, Inc. 4757 Nexus Center Drive San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2020/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Burgard, Anthony P. 10520 Waterridge Circle San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 02 /
Burk, Mark J. 10520 Waterridge Circle San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 03 /
Osterhout, Robin E. 10520 Waterridge Circle San Diego, CA 92121 / US | 04 /
Pharkya, Priti 10520 Waterridge Circle San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/31] | Application number, filing date | 19212136.6 | 30.04.2010 | [2020/31] | Priority number, date | US20090174473P | 30.04.2009 Original published format: US 174473 P | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3686272 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C12N1/21, C12P7/18, C12N9/04 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
C12P7/18 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N15/52 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12N9/0006 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07C29/80 (US);
C12N1/00 (KR);
C12N1/02 (KR);
C12N1/20 (KR);
C12N1/38 (KR);
C12N9/0008 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/1029 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/1096 (EP,CN,US);
C12N9/88 (EP,CN,US);
C12P7/16 (KR);
C12Y101/0101 (CN);
C12Y101/01157 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C12Y102/01 (CN,US);
C12Y206/01 (CN,US);
C12Y401/01 (CN,US);
C12Y402/01 (CN,US);
C12Y403/01 (CN,US);
C12Y101/01 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Title | German: | ORGANISMEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1,3-BUTANDIOL | [2020/31] | English: | ORGANISMS FOR THE PRODUCTION OF 1,3-BUTANEDIOL | [2020/31] | French: | ORGANISMES DE PRODUCTION DE 1,3-BUTANEDIOL | [2020/31] | Examination procedure | 30.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/27] | 19.02.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2021/27] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10770464.5 / EP2424975 | EP16168278.6 / EP3135760 | EP17188529.6 / EP3318626 | Divisional application(s) | EP21153963.0 / EP3865569 | EP23201197.3 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2003032152 (PORRO DANILO [IT], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * * paragraph [0001] * * claims 1, 12, 13 * [Y] 11-15; | [XY]WO2008080124 (GEVO [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * the whole document * * page 55; example 29 * [Y] 1-15; | [Y] - MATSUYAMA A ET AL, "Industrial production of (R)-1,3-butanediol by new biocatalysts", JOURNAL OF MOLECULAR CATALYSIS. B, ENZYMATIC, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 11, no. 4-6, ISSN 1381-1177, (20010122), pages 513 - 521, (20010122), XP027407301 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * * abstract * * tables 1, 2 * | [XA] - YUAN-ZHENG QIU ET AL, "Production of Poly(3-hydroxybutyrate-co-3-hydroxyhexanoate) from Gluconate and Glucose by Recombinant Aeromonas hydrophila and Pseudomonas putida", BIOTECHNOLOGY LETTERS, SPRINGER NETHERLANDS, DORDRECHT, (20050901), vol. 27, no. 18, doi:10.1007/S10529-005-3685-6, ISSN 1573-6776, pages 1381 - 1386, XP019230960 [X] 1-10 * the whole document * * abstract * [A] 11-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s10529-005-3685-6 | [T] - Naoya Kataoka ET AL, "Improvement of (R)-1,3-butanediol production by engineered Escherichia coli", Journal of bioscience and bioengineering, Japan, doi:10.1016/j.jbiosc.2012.11.025, (20130104), pages 475 - 480, URL: http://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pubmed/23290993, (20131119), XP055089100 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jbiosc.2012.11.025 | [T] - YUDONG JIANG ET AL, "Microbial production of short chain diols", MICROBIAL CELL FACTORIES, BIOMED CENTRAL, GB, (20141210), vol. 13, no. 1, doi:10.1186/S12934-014-0165-5, ISSN 1475-2859, page 165, XP021207510 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/s12934-014-0165-5 | by applicant | US2002012939 | WO02055995 | US2002168654 | US2003059792 | US2003224363 | US2003233218 | WO03106998 | US2004009466 | US2004029149 | US2004072723 | US2005221466 | US7127379 | WO2008115840 | WO2009014437 | US2009047719 | US2009075351 | - ICHIKAWA et al., J. of Molecular Catalysis A-Chemical, (20060000), vol. 256, pages 106 - 112 | - ICHIKAWA et al., J. of Molecular Catalysis A-Chemical, (20050000), vol. 231, pages 181 - 189 | - TANI et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20000000), vol. 66, pages 5231 - 5235 | - ATSUMI et al., Nature, (20080000), vol. 451, pages 86 - 89 | - SULZENBACHER et al., J. of Molecular Biology, (20040000), vol. 342, pages 489 - 502 | - WALTER et al., J. of Bacteriology, (19920000), vol. 174, pages 7149 - 7158 | - PEREZ et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20080000), vol. 283, pages 7346 - 7353 | - KINOSHITA et al., Appl. Microbiol. Biotechnol, (19850000), vol. 22, pages 249 - 254 | - BRAVO et al., J. Forensic Sci., (20040000), vol. 49, pages 379 - 387 | - WOLFF et al., Protein Expr. Purif., (19950000), vol. 6, pages 206 - 212 | - BREITKREUZ et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, pages 18588 - 18596 | - JEON et al., J. Biotechnol., (20080000), vol. 135, pages 127 - 133 | - LOKANATH et al., J. Mol. Biol., (20050000), vol. 352, pages 905 - 917 | - MANNING et al., Biochem J., (19850000), vol. 231, pages 481 - 484 | - HAWES et al., Methods Enzymol, (20000000), vol. 324, pages 218 - 228 | - CHOWDHURY et al., Biosci. Biotechnol Biochem., (19960000), vol. 60, pages 2043 - 2047 | - ABERHART et al., J. Chem. Soc., (19790000), vol. 6, pages 1404 - 1406 | - CHOWDHURY et al., Biosci. Biotechnol Biochem., (20030000), vol. 67, pages 438 - 441 | - STAMES et al., Biochemistry, (19730000), vol. 11, pages 677 - 687 | - SIBILLI et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19810000), vol. 256, pages 10228 - 10230 | - JAMES et al., Biochemistry, (20020000), vol. 41, pages 3720 - 3725 | - CAHYANTO et al., Microbiology, (20060000), vol. 152, pages 205 - 112 | - JACQUES et al., Biochem. Biophys. Acta, (20010000), vol. 1544, pages 28 - 41 | - JONES et al., Microbiol. Rev., (19860000), vol. 50, pages 484 - 524 | - YOUNGLESON et al., J. Bacteriol., (19890000), vol. 171, pages 6800 - 6807 | - BINSTOCK et al., Methods Enzymol., (19810000), vol. 71C, pages 403 - 411 | - PLOUX et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (19880000), vol. 174, pages 177 - 182 | - ALBER et al., Mol. Microbiol., (20060000), vol. 61, pages 297 - 309 | - PEOPLES et al., Mol. Microbiol., (19890000), vol. 3, pages 349 - 357 | - HILLMERGOTTSCHALK, Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19740000), vol. 3334, pages 12 - 23 | - WAKIL et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19540000), vol. 207, pages 631 - 63 8 | - BERG et al., Archaea. Science, (20070000), vol. 318, pages 1782 - 1786 | - ISMAIEL et al., J. Bacteriol, (19930000), vol. 175, pages 5097 - 5105 | - LAMED et al., Biochem. J., (19810000), vol. 195, pages 183 - 190 | - PERETZ et al., Biochemistry, (19890000), vol. 28, pages 6549 - 6555 | - KILLENBERG-JABS et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (20010000), vol. 268, pages 1698 - 1704 | - EDEGGER et al., Chem. Commun. (Camb), (20060000), pages 2402 - 2404 | - KOSJEK et al., Biotechnol. Bioeng., (20040000), vol. 86, pages 55 - 62 | - STEINBUCHEL et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (19830000), vol. 130, pages 329 - 334 | - SUDA et al., Arch. Biochem. Biophys., (19760000), vol. 176, pages 610 - 620 | - SUDA et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (19770000), vol. 77, pages 586 - 591 | - MARKS et al., J. BioJ. Chem., (19920000), vol. 267, pages 15459 - 15463 | - KESSLER et al., FEBS. Lett., (19910000), vol. 281, pages 59 - 63 | - FONTAINE et al., J. Bacteriol., (20020000), vol. 184, pages 2404 - 2410 | - KAZAHAYA et al., J. Gen. Appl. Microbiol., (19720000), vol. 18, pages 43 - 55 | - KOO et al., Biotechnol. Lett., (20050000), vol. 27, pages 505 - 510 | - STRAUSS et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (19930000), vol. 215, pages 421 - 429 | - KLATT et al., Environ. Microbiol., (20070000), vol. 9, pages 2067 - 2078 | - METZ et al., Plant Physiology, (20000000), vol. 122, pages 635 - 644 | - REISER et al., J. of Bacteriology, (19970000), vol. 179, pages 2969 - 2975 | - ISHIGE et al., Appl. Environ. MiavbioL, (20020000), vol. 68, pages 1192 - 1195 | - BOYNTON et al., J. Bacteriol., (19960000), vol. 178, pages 3015 - 3024 | - TAKAHASHI et al., J. Bacteriol, (20000000), vol. 182, pages 4704 - 4710 | - POWLOWSKI et al., J. Bacteriol., (19930000), vol. 175, pages 377 - 385 | - KOSAKA et al., Biosci. Biotechnol. Biochem., (20070000), vol. 71, pages 58 - 61 | - THAUER, R.K., Science, (20070000), vol. 318, pages 1732 - 1733 | - ALBER et al., J. BacterioL, (20060000), vol. 188, pages 8551 - 8559 | - TOTH et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol, (19990000), vol. 65, pages 4973 - 4980 | - MCPHERSON et al., Nucleic.Acids Res., (19830000), vol. 11, pages 5257 - 5266 | - KORBER et al., J.Mol.Biol., (19930000), vol. 234, pages 1270 - 1273 | - KORT et al., Extremophiles, (19970000), vol. 1, pages 52 - 60 | - LEBBINK et al., J.MolBiol., (19980000), vol. 280, pages 287 - 296 | - LEBBINK et al., J.Mol.Biol., (19990000), vol. 289, pages 357 - 369 | - INGOLDSBY et al., Gene, (20050000), vol. 349, pages 237 - 244 | - KHAN et al., Biosci.Biotechnol Biochem., (20050000), vol. 69, pages 1861 - 1870 | - PURNELL et al., Planta, (20050000), vol. 222, pages 167 - 180 | - ABIKO et al., Plant Cell Physiol, (20050000), vol. 46, pages 1724 - 1734 | - DIAZ et al., Extremophiles, (20060000), vol. 10, pages 105 - 115 | - HAYDEN et al., FEMS Microbiol Lett., (20020000), vol. 211, pages 37 - 41 | - ROCA et al., Appl Environ.Microbiol, (20030000), vol. 69, pages 4732 - 4736 | - STOYAN et al., JBioteehnol, (19970000), vol. 54, pages 77 - 80 | - ANSORGE et al., BiotechnolBioeng, (20000000), vol. 68, pages 557 - 562 | - YANG et al., J.Biol.Chem., (20030000), vol. 278, pages 8804 - 8808 | - KREIMEYER et al., JBiolChem., (20070000), vol. 282, pages 7191 - 7197 | - BAKER et al., JBiol.Chem., (19720000), vol. 247, pages 7724 - 7734 | - BAKER et al., Biochemistry, (19740000), vol. 13, pages 292 - 299 | - MISONO et al., JBacteriol., (19820000), vol. 150, pages 398 - 401 | - HEYDARI et al., Appl Environ.Microbiol, (20040000), vol. 70, pages 937 - 942 | - HASHIMOTO et al., JBiochem., (19890000), vol. 106, pages 76 - 80 | - MISONONAGASAKI, J Bacteri ., (19820000), vol. 150, pages 398 - 401 | - RULDEEKULTHAMRONG et al., BMB.Rep., (20080000), vol. 41, pages 790 - 795 | - JENG et al., A. Biochemistry, (19740000), vol. 13, pages 2898 - 2903 | - KENKLIES et al., Microbiology, (19990000), vol. 145, pages 819 - 826 | - YAGI et al., FEBS Lett., (19790000), vol. 100, pages 81 - 84 | - YAGI et al., Methods Enzymol., (19850000), vol. 133, pages 83 - 89 | - YAGI et al., J. Biochem., (19820000), vol. 92, pages 35 - 43 | - KWOK et al., J. Exp. Bot., (20040000), vol. 55, pages 595 - 604 | - DE LA et al., Plant J., (20060000), vol. 46, pages 414 - 425 | - WILKIE et al., Protein Expr. Purif., (19980000), vol. 12, pages 381 - 389 | - RECASENS et al., Biochemistry, (19800000), vol. 19, pages 4583 - 4589 | - WHALEN et al., J. Bacteriol., (19820000), vol. 150, pages 739 - 746 | - HUGHES et al., J. Bacteriol., (19840000), vol. 158, pages 571 - 574 | - MIYAZAKI et al., Microbiol., (20040000), vol. 150, pages 2327 - 2334 | - OKUNO et al., Enz. Prot., (19930000), vol. 47, pages 136 - 148 | - TANIZAWA et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19890000), vol. 264, pages 2450 - 2454 | - PEISACH et al., Biochemistry, (19980000), vol. 37, pages 9918 - 9930 | - GUTIERREZ et al., Eur. J. Biochem, (20000000), vol. 267, pages 7218 - 7223 | - GUTIERREZ et al., Protein Eng., (19980000), vol. 11, pages 53 - 58 | - TAYLOR et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (19970000), vol. 1350, pages 38 - 40 | - BONNARME et al., J. Bacteriol., (19950000), vol. 177, pages 3573 - 3578 | - MARTINEZ-CARRION et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19650000), vol. 240, pages 3538 - 3546 | - CHANDRA et al., ARch. Microbiol., (20010000), vol. 176, pages 443 - 451 | - ICHIKAWA et al., J. Mol. Catalysis A-Chem., (20060000), vol. 256, pages 106 - 112 | - CHOPRA et al., Protein Expr. Purif., (20020000), vol. 25, pages 533 - 540 | - KUZNETSOVA et al., FEMSMicrobiol. Rev., (20050000), vol. 29, pages 263 - 279 | - KANAMASA et al., Appl. Microbiol Biotechnol., (20080000), vol. 80, pages 223 - 229 | - DRUMMOND et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19600000), vol. 235, pages 318 - 325 | - HAMMER et al., J Basic Microbiol, (19920000), vol. 32, pages 21 - 27 | - FUJII et al., JBiochem., (20000000), vol. 128, pages 391 - 397 | - ROMERO et al., J nd.Microbiol Biotechnol, (19970000), vol. 18, pages 241 - 246 | - TOBIN et al., J Bacteriol., (19910000), vol. 173, pages 6223 - 6229 | - SODA et al., Biochemistry, (19680000), vol. 7, pages 4110 - 4119 | - IKAI et al., J Bacteriol, (19970000), vol. 179, pages 5118 - 5125 | - LU et al., J Bacteriol, (20020000), vol. 184, pages 3765 - 3773 | - SAMSONOVA et al., BMC.Microbiol, (20030000), vol. 3, page 2 | - KIM, JBiolChem., (19640000), vol. 239, pages 783 - 786 | - LI et al., Biochemistry, (19990000), vol. 38, pages 10004 - 10012 | - SCHURE et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (19980000), vol. 64, pages 1303 - 1307 | - SIEGERT et al., Protein Eng. Des. Sel., (20050000), vol. 18, pages 345 - 357 | - CHANDRA et al., Arch. Microbiol., (20010000), vol. 176, pages 443 - 451 | - KRIEGER et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (20020000), vol. 269, pages 3256 - 3263 | - POLOVNIKOVA et al., Biochemistry, (20030000), vol. 42, pages 1820 - 1830 | - LINGEN et al., Chembiochem, (20030000), vol. 4, pages 721 - 726 | - LINGEN et al., Protein Eng., (20020000), vol. 15, pages 585 - 593 | - BARROWMAN et al., FEMS Microbiology Letters, (19860000), vol. 34, pages 57 - 60 | - HENNING et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20060000), vol. 72, pages 7510 - 7517 | - TIAN et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20050000), vol. 102, pages 10670 - 10675 | - GREEN et al., J. Bacteriol., (20000000), vol. 182, pages 2838 - 2844 | - SHIGEOKA et al., Arch. Biochem. Biophys., (19910000), vol. 288, pages 22 - 28 | - OKU et al., J Biol. Chem., (19880000), vol. 263, pages 18386 - 18396 | - SMIT et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20050000), vol. 71, pages 303 - 311 | - BERTHOLD et al., D. Biol. Crystallogr., (20070000), vol. 63, pages 1217 - 1224 | - MOMANY et al., D. BioL Crystallogr., (20020000), vol. 58, pages 549 - 552 | - KEFALA et al., Acta. Crystallogr. Sect. F. Struct. Biol. Cryst. Commun., (20050000), vol. 61, pages 782 - 784 | - ANDERSEN et al., Gene, (19930000), vol. 124, pages 105 - 109 | - TSUJIMOTO et al., J. Biotechnol, (20060000), vol. 124, pages 327 - 337 | - HU et al., J. BioL Chem., (20080000), vol. 283, pages 21284 - 21293 | - QU et al., Biochem. J., (20030000), vol. 375, pages 465 - 470 | - FITZGERALD et al., DNA, (19890000), vol. 8, pages 623 - 634 | - DUSCH et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (19990000), vol. 65, pages 1530 - 1539 | - RAMJEE et al., Biochem. J., (19970000), vol. 323, pages 661 - 669 | - MERKEL et al., FEMS Microbiol. Lett., (19960000), vol. 143, pages 247 - 252 | - SCHMITZBERGER et al., EMBOJ., (20030000), vol. 22, pages 6193 - 6204 | - TANAKA et al., J. Appl. Microbiol., (20080000), vol. 104, pages 1283 - 1293 | - TAKATSUKA et al., Biosci. Biotechnol Biochem., (19990000), vol. 63, pages 1843 - 1846 | - LEE et al., Biochem. J., (20010000), vol. 360, pages 657 - 665 | - GUIRARD et al., JBiol.Chem., (19800000), vol. 255, pages 5960 - 5964 | - LEE et al., JBiol. Chem., (20070000), vol. 282, pages 27115 - 27125 | - WILLKE et al., Appl. Microbiol. Biotechnol., (20010000), vol. 56, pages 289 - 295 | - KANAMASA et al., Appl. Microbiol. BiotechnoL, (20080000), vol. 80, pages 223 - 229 | - SHINGLER et al., J. Bacteriol., (19920000), vol. 174, pages 711 - 724 | - KATO et al., Arch. Microbiol., (19970000), vol. 168, pages 457 - 463 | - IFFLAND et al., Biochemistry, (20000000), vol. 39, pages 10790 - 10798 | - LIAN et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19940000), vol. 116, pages 10403 - 10411 | - CLAUSEN et al., Gene, (19940000), vol. 142, pages 107 - 112 | - BARTHELMEBS et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20010000), vol. 67, pages 1063 - 1069 | - RODRIGUEZ et al., J. Agric. Food Chem., (20080000), vol. 56, pages 3068 - 3072 | - QI et al., Biochem. J., (20070000), vol. 375, pages 465 - 470 | - UCHIYAMA et al., Biosci. Biotechnol. Biochem., (20080000), vol. 72, pages 116 - 123 | - HASHIDOKO et al., Biosci. Biotech. Biochem., (19940000), vol. 58, pages 217 - 218 | - CAVIN et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol.., (19980000), vol. 64, pages 1466 - 1471 | - HUANG et al., J. Bacteriol., (19940000), vol. 176, pages 5912 - 5918 | - SARIASLANI, F.S., Annu. Rev. Microbiol., (20070000), vol. 61, pages 51 - 69 | - BENNER et al., J. Am. Chem. So., (19810000), vol. 103, pages 993 - 994 | - HIGHBARGER et al., Biochemistry, (19960000), vol. 35, pages 41 - 46 | - PETERSEN et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (19900000), vol. 56, pages 3491 - 3498 | - ROZZEL et al., J. Am. Chem. Soc., (19840000), vol. 106, pages 4937 - 4941 | - KOSAKA et al., Biosci.Biotechnol Biochem., (20070000), vol. 71, pages 58 - 68 | - RAVAGNANI et al., Mol. Microbiol., (20000000), vol. 37, pages 1172 - 1185 | - MATIASEK et al., Curr. Microbiol., (20010000), vol. 42, pages 276 - 281 | - KALAPOS, Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (20030000), vol. 1621, pages 122 - 139 | - WEAVER, T., B. Biol. Crystallogr., (20050000), vol. 61, pages 1395 - 1401 | - TSENG et al., J Bacteriol, (20010000), vol. 183, pages 461 - 467 | - WOODS et al., Biochem. Biophys. Acta., (19880000), vol. 954, pages 14 - 26 | - GUEST et al., J. Gen. Microbiol., (19850000), vol. 131, pages 2971 - 2984 | - SMITH et al., Int. J. Biochem. Cell Bioi., (19990000), vol. 31, pages 961 - 975 | - MIZOBATA et al., Arch. Biochem. Biophys., (19980000), vol. 355, pages 49 - 55 | - KOBAYASHI et al., J. Biochem., (19810000), vol. 89, pages 1923 - 1931 | - SHIMOYAMA et al., FEMS Microbiol. Lett, (20070000), vol. 270, pages 207 - 213 | - ALHAPEL et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. USA, (20060000), vol. 103, pages 12341 - 12346 | - KOLLMANN-KOCH et al., Physiol. Chem., (19840000), vol. 365, pages 847 - 857 | - WANG et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19690000), vol. 244, pages 2516 - 2526 | - HILLMER et al., FEBS Lett., (19720000), vol. 21, pages 351 - 354 | - ROBERTS et al., Arch. Microbiol., (19780000), vol. 117, pages 99 - 108 | - AGNIHOTRI et al., Bioorg. Med. Chem., (20030000), vol. 11, pages 9 - 20 | - CONRAD et al., J. Bacteriol., (19740000), vol. 118, pages 103 - 111 | - OLIVERA et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci USA, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 6419 - 6424 | - PARK et al., J Bacteriol., (20030000), vol. 185, pages 5391 - 5397 | - ISMAIL et al., Eur. J. Biochem., (20030000), vol. 270, pages 3047 - 3054 | - PARK et al., Appl. Biochem. Biotechnol., (20040000), vol. 113-116, pages 335 - 346 | - PARK et al., Biotechnol Bioeng., (20040000), vol. 86, pages 681 - 686 | - MATTHIES et al., Appl. Environ. Micriobiol., (19920000), vol. 58, pages 1435 - 1439 | - SCHERF et al., Arch. Microbiol.,, (19940000), vol. 161, pages 239 - 245 | - MA et al., Ann. N.Y. Acad. Sci., (19920000), vol. 672, pages 60 - 65 | - ASANO et al., Biomol. Eng., (20050000), vol. 22, pages 95 - 101 | - SJOSTROM et al., Biochem. Biophys. Acta., (19970000), vol. 1324, pages 182 - 190 | - TAKAGI et al., J. Biochem., (19840000), vol. 96, pages 545 - 552 | - TAKAGI et al., J. Bacteriol., (19850000), vol. 161, pages 1 - 6 | - ASUNCION et al., JBiol Chem., (20020000), vol. 277, pages 8306 - 8311 | - KATO et al., Arch.Microbiol, (19970000), vol. 168, pages 457 - 463 | - ASANO et al., FEMS Microbiol Lett, (19940000), vol. 118, pages 255 - 258 | - NOWICKI et al., Biochim. Biophys. Acta, (20010000), vol. 1546, pages 268 - 281 | - BREDWELL et al., Biotechnol Prog., (19990000), vol. 15, pages 834 - 844 | - HOFFINEISTER et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20050000), vol. 280, pages 4329 - 4338 | - LIN et al., Biotechnol. Bioeng., (20050000), vol. 90, pages 775 - 779 | - HANAI et al., Appl. Environ. Microbiol., (20070000), vol. 73, pages 7814 - 7818 | - SAKAI et al., JBiosci.Bioeng, (20050000), vol. 99, pages 252 - 258 | - DATAR et al., Biotechnol Bioeng, (20040000), vol. 86, pages 587 - 594 | - NAJAFPOUR et al., Enzyme and Microbial Technology, (20060000), vol. 38, no. 1-2, pages 223 - 228 | - AHMED et al., Biotechnol Bioeng, (20070000), vol. 97, pages 1080 - 1086 | - HIRANO et al., J. Biosci. Bioeng., (20050000), vol. 100, pages 318 - 322 | - PAXTON et al., Biochem. J., (19860000), vol. 234, pages 295 - 303 | - SINCLAIR et al., Biochem. Mol. BioI. Int., (19930000), vol. 31, pages 911 - 922 | - WARD et al., Archaea., (20020000), vol. 1, pages 133 - 141 | - VERNAL et al., FEMS Microbiol. Lett., (20030000), vol. 229, pages 217 - 222 | - VERNAL et al., Mol. Biochem. Parasitol., (19980000), vol. 96, pages 83 - 92 | - REETZ et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed Engl., (19970000), vol. 36, pages 2830 - 2832 | - REETZ et al., Angew. Chem. Int. Ed Engl., (20050000), vol. 44, pages 4192 - 4196 | - YANO et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci U. S. A, (19980000), vol. 95, pages 5511 - 5515 | - JIANG et al., Science, (20080000), vol. 319, pages 1387 - 1391 | - COCO et al., Nat. Biotechnol., (20010000), vol. 19, pages 354 - 359 | - HERMES et al., Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci. U. S. A, (19900000), vol. 87, pages 696 - 700 | - FUJITA et al., Biosci. Biotechnol Biochem., (20010000), vol. 65, pages 2695 - 2700 | - JOHNSON et al., Plant J., (20010000), vol. 25, pages 325 - 333 | - DOYLE et al., Biochemistry, (20010000), vol. 40, pages 4234 - 4241 | - CHO et al., Arch. Biochem. Biophys., (20030000), vol. 419, pages 139 - 146 | - ZHANG et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci US. A, (19970000), vol. 94, pages 4504 - 4509 | - ONUFFER et al., Protein Sci., (19950000), vol. 4, pages 1750 - 1757 | - SIEGERT et al., Protein EngDes Sel, (20050000), vol. 18, pages 345 - 357 | - KUMAMARU et al., Nat. Biotechnol, (19980000), vol. 16, pages 663 - 666 | - KINO et al., Appl. Microbiol. Biotechnol., (20070000), vol. 73, pages 1299 - 1305 | - MENG et al., Biochemistry, (19940000), vol. 33, pages 12879 - 12885 | - LIN et al., Biotechnol. Prog., (19990000), vol. 15, page 467471 | - CLARKE et al., Biochem. Biophys. Res. Commun., (19870000), vol. 148, pages 15 - 23 | - WILKS et al., Biochemistry, (19900000), vol. 29, pages 8587 - 8591 | - REIDHAAR-OLSON, J. F.R. T. SAUER, "Combinatorial cassette mutagenesis as a probe of the informational content of protein sequences", Science, (19880000), vol. 241, pages 1541 - 1544 | - HOGAN et al., Biochemistry, (19950000), vol. 34, pages 4225 - 4230 | - WILKS et al., Biochemistry, (19920000), vol. 31, pages 7802 - 7806 | - HIBBERT, E. G.F. BAGANZH. C. HAILESJ. M. WARDG. J. LYEJ. M. WOODLEYP. A. DALBY, "Directed evolution of biocatalytic processes", Biomol.Eng, (20050000), vol. 22, doi:10.1016/j.bioeng.2004.09.003, pages 11 - 19, XP004862541 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bioeng.2004.09.003 | - "Enzyme evolution for chemical process applications", HUISMAN, G. W.J. J. LALONDE, Biocatalysis in the pharmaceutical and biotechnology industries, CRC Press, (20070000), pages 717 - 742 | - OTTEN, L. G.W. J. QUAX, "Directed evolution: selecting today's biocatalysts", Biomol.Eng, (20050000), vol. 22, doi:10.1016/j.bioeng.2005.02.002, pages 1 - 9, XP004862540 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bioeng.2005.02.002 | - SEN, S.D. VENKATA, VB. MANDAL, "Developments in directed evolution for improving enzyme functions", Appl Biochem.Biotechnol, (20070000), vol. 143, pages 212 - 223 | - PRITCHARD, L.D. COMED. KELLJ. ROWLANDM. WINSON, "A general model of error-prone PCR", J Theor.Biol, (20050000), vol. 234, doi:10.1016/j.jtbi.2004.12.005, pages 497 - 509, XP004820145 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jtbi.2004.12.005 | - FUJII, R.M. KITAOKAK. HAYASHI, "One-step random mutagenesis by error-prone rolling circle amplification", Nucleic Acids Res, (20040000), vol. 32, page el45 | - FUJII, R.M. KITAOKAK. HAYASHI, "Error-prone rolling circle amplification: the simplest random mutagenesis protocol", NatProtoc., (20060000), vol. 1, doi:10.1038/nprot.2006.403, pages 2493 - 2497, XP001537727 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2006.403 | - STEMMER, W. P., "DNA shuffling by random fragmentation and reassembly: in vitro recombination for molecular evolution", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S.A, (19940000), vol. 91, doi:10.1073/pnas.91.22.10747, pages 10747 - 10751, XP002912215 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.91.22.10747 | - STEMMER, W. P., "Rapid evolution of a protein in vitro by DNA shuffling", Nature, (19940000), vol. 370, doi:10.1038/370389a0, pages 389 - 391, XP002082182 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/370389a0 | - ZHAO, H.L. GIVERZ. SHAOJ. A. AFTHOLTERF. H. ARNOLD, "Molecular evolution by staggered extension process (StEP) in vitro recombination", Nat.Biotechnol, (19980000), vol. 16, doi:10.1038/nbt0398-258, pages 258 - 261, XP000775867 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt0398-258 | - SHAO, Z.H. ZHAOL. GIVERF. H. ARNOLD, "Random-priming in vitro recombination: an effective tool for directed evolution", Nucleic Acids Res, (19980000), vol. 26, doi:10.1093/nar/26.2.681, pages 681 - 683, XP002162556 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/26.2.681 | - VOLKOV, A. A.Z. SHAOF. H. ARNOLD, "Recombination and chimeragenesis by in vitro heteroduplex formation and in vivo repair", Nucleic Acids Res, (19990000), vol. 27, page el8 | - VOLKOV, A. A.Z. SHAOF. H. ARNOLD, "Random chimeragenesis by heteroduplex recombination", Methods Enzymol., (20000000), vol. 328, doi:10.1016/S0076-6879(00)28412-7, pages 456 - 463, XP000990804 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0076-6879(00)28412-7 | - COCO, W. M.W. E. LEVINSONM. J. CRISTH. J. HEKTORA. DARZINSP. T. PIENKOSC. H. SQUIRESD. J. MONTICELLO, "DNA shuffling method for generating highly recombined genes and evolved enzymes", Nat.Biotechnol, (20010000), vol. 19, doi:10.1038/86744, pages 354 - 359, XP002185585 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/86744 | - LEE, S. H.E. J. RYUM. J. KANGE.-S. WANGZ. C. Y. PIAOK. J. J. JUNGY. SHIN, "A new approach to directed gene evolution by recombined extension on truncated templates (RETT", J.Molec.Catalysis, (20030000), vol. 26, pages 119 - 129 | - BERGQUIST, P. L.M. D. GIBBS, "Degenerate oligonucleotide gene shuffling", Methods MoLBiol, (20070000), vol. 352, pages 191 - 204 | - BERGQUIST, P. L.R. A. REEVESM. D. GIBBS, "Degenerate oligonucleotide gene shuffling (DOGS) and random drift mutagenesis (RNDM): two complementary techniques for enzyme evolution", Biomol.Eng, (20050000), vol. 22, doi:10.1016/j.bioeng.2004.10.002, pages 63 - 72, XP004862547 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bioeng.2004.10.002 | - GIBBS, M. D.K. M NEVALAINENP. L. BERGQUIST, "Degenerate oligonucleotide gene shuffling (DOGS): a method for enhancing the frequency of recombination with family shuffling", Gene, (20010000), vol. 271, doi:10.1016/S0378-1119(01)00506-6, pages 13 - 20, XP004245489 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(01)00506-6 | - OSTERMEIER et al., Proc NatlAcadSci US.A., (19990000), vol. 96, pages 3562 - 3567 | - OSTERMEIER et al., Nat.Biotechnol., (19990000), vol. 17, pages 1205 - 1209 | - LUTZ, S.M. OSTERMEIERS. J. BENKOVIC, "Rapid generation of incremental truncation libraries for protein engineering using alpha-phosphothioate nucleotides", Nucleic Acids Res, (20010000), vol. 29, doi:10.1093/nar/29.18.3873, page E16, XP002451644 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/29.18.3873 | - LUTZ et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci U S.A., (20010000), vol. 98, pages 11248 - 11253 | - BERGQUIST et al., BiomolEng., (20050000), vol. 22, pages 63 - 72 | - WONG et al., Biotechnol J., (20080000), vol. 3, pages 74 - 82 | - MULLER et al., Nucleic Acids Res, (20050000), vol. 33, page el 17 | - WONG et al., Anal.Biochem., (20050000), vol. 341, pages 187 - 189 | - NESS et al., Nat.Biotechnol, (20020000), vol. 20, pages 1251 - 1255 | - SIEBER, V.C. A. MARTINEZF. H. ARNOLD, "Libraries of hybrid proteins from distantly related sequences", Nat.Biotechnol, (20010000), vol. 19, doi:10.1038/88129, pages 456 - 460, XP002236807 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/88129 | - KRETZ, K. A.T. H. RICHARDSONK. A. GRAYD. E. ROBERTSONX. TANJ. M. SHORT, "Gene site saturation mutagenesis: a comprehensive mutagenesis approach", Methods Enzymol., (20040000), vol. 388, pages 3 - 11 | - REIDHAAR-OLSON, J. F.J. U. BOWIER. M. BREYERJ. C. HUK. L. KNIGHTW. A. LIMM. C. MOSSINGD. A. PARSELLK. R. SHOEMAKERR. T. SAUER, "Random mutagenesis of protein sequences using oligonucleotide cassettes", Methods Enzymol., (19910000), vol. 208, doi:10.1016/0076-6879(91)08029-H, pages 564 - 586, XP008070927 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0076-6879(91)08029-H | - REETZ, M. T.S. WILENSEKD. ZHAK. E. JAEGER, "Directed Evolution of an Enantioselective Enzyme through Combinatorial Multiple-Cassette Mutagenesis", Angew.Chem.Int.Ed EngL, (20010000), vol. 40, doi:10.1002/1521-3773(20011001)40:19<3589::AID-ANIE3589>3.0.CO;2-X, pages 3589 - 3591, XP002214680 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-3773(20011001)40:19<3589::AID-ANIE3589>3.0.CO;2-X | - SELIFONOVA, O.F. VALLEV. SCHELLENBERGER, "Rapid evolution of novel traits in microorganisms", Appl Environ Microbiol, (20010000), vol. 67, doi:10.1128/AEM.67.8.3645-3649.2001, pages 3645 - 3649, XP001021467 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/AEM.67.8.3645-3649.2001 | - WINTERCOWORKERS, J. Mol. Biol., (19960000), vol. 260, pages 359 - 3680 | - RAJPAL, A.N. BEYAZL. HABERG. CAPPUCCILLIH. YEER. R. BHATTT. TAKEUCHIR. A. LERNERR. CREA, "A general method for greatly improving the affinity of antibodies by using combinatorial libraries", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S.A, (20050000), vol. 102, doi:10.1073/pnas.0503543102, pages 8466 - 8471, XP002392777 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0503543102 | - HAYES, R. J.J. BENTZIENM. L. ARYM. Y. HWANGJ. M. JACINTOJ. VIELMETTERA. KUNDUB. I. DAHIYAT, "Combining computational and experimental screening for rapid optimization of protein properties", Proc Natl Acad Sci U S.A, (20020000), vol. 99, doi:10.1073/pnas.212627499, pages 15926 - 15931, XP002340572 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.212627499 | - REETZ, M. T.J. D. CARBALLEIRA, "Iterative saturation mutagenesis (ISM) for rapid directed evolution of functional enzymes", Nat.Protoc., (20070000), vol. 2, doi:10.1038/nprot.2007.72, pages 891 - 903, XP001538725 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2007.72 | - REETZ, M. T.J. D. CARBALLEIRAA. VOGEL, "Iterative saturation mutagenesis on the basis of B factors as a strategy for increasing protein thermostability", Angew.Chem.Int.Ed EngL, (20060000), vol. 45, pages 7745 - 7751 | - BURGARD et al., Biotechnol. Bioeng., (20030000), vol. 84, pages 647 - 657 | - BURGARD et al., Biotechnol. Prog., (20010000), vol. 17, pages 791 - 797 | - BURGARD et al., Bbtechnol. Bioengineer., (20030000), vol. 84, pages 647 - 657 | - FONGPALSSON, Nat. Genet., (20040000), vol. 36, pages 1056 - 1058 | - ALPER et al., Science, (20060000), vol. 314, pages 1565 - 1568 | - BURGARD et al., Biotechnol. Bioengineer., (20030000), vol. 84, pages 647 - 657 | - "GenBank", Database accession no. AAP42563.1 | - LIN et al., Biotechnol Bioeng., (20050000), vol. 90, pages 775 - 779 |