blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3653211

EP3653211 - TRANS-4-{2-[4-(2,3-DICHLOROPHENYL)-PIPERAZIN-1-YL]-ETHYL}-N,N-DIMETHYLCARBAMOYL-CYCLO-HEXYLAMINE FOR TREATING NEGATIVE SYMPTOMS OF SCHIZOPHRENIA [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.05.2021
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  17.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.04.2024New entry: Observations by third parties 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Richter Gedeon Nyrt.
Gyömröi út 19-21
1103 Budapest / HU
[2020/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Pitter, János György
Alsóerdösor u. 55/A.
2030 Érd / HU
02 / Szatmári, Balázs
Sarlósfecske u. 21.
1173 Budapest / HU
03 / Debelle, Marc
Emilio Noelting 16A
68100 Mulhouse / FR
04 / Németh, György József
Hüvösvölgyi út 151/A.
1021 Budapest / HU
05 / Laszlovszky, István
Bartók Béla út 16.
1111 Budapest / HU
 [2020/21]
Representative(s)Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
[2020/21]
Application number, filing date19213168.828.11.2013
[2020/21]
Priority number, dateHU2012000069129.11.2012         Original published format: HU 1200691
[2020/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3653211
Date:20.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:A61K31/495, A61P25/18
[2020/21]
CPC:
A61K31/495 (EP,KR,US); A61K31/496 (KR); A61K31/4965 (KR);
A61P25/18 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/21]
Extension statesBA03.12.2019
ME03.12.2019
TitleGerman:TRANS-4-{2-[4-(2,3-DICHLORPHENYL)-PIPERAZIN-1-YL]-ETHYL}-N,N-DIMETHYLCARBAMOYL-CYCLO-HEXYLAMIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG NEGATIVER SYMPTOME VON SCHIZOPHRENIE[2020/28]
English:TRANS-4-{2-[4-(2,3-DICHLOROPHENYL)-PIPERAZIN-1-YL]-ETHYL}-N,N-DIMETHYLCARBAMOYL-CYCLO-HEXYLAMINE FOR TREATING NEGATIVE SYMPTOMS OF SCHIZOPHRENIA[2020/21]
French:TRANS-4-{2-[4-(2,3-DICHLOROPHÉNYL)-PIPÉRAZIN-1-YL]-ÉTHYL}-N,N-DIMÉTHYLCARBAMOYL-CYCLOHÉXYLAMINE POUR TRAITER DES SYMPTÔMES DÉFICITAIRES DE LA SCHIZOPHRÉNIE[2020/21]
Former [2020/21]TRANS-4-{2-[4-(2,3-DICHLOROPHENYL)-PIPERAZIN-1-YL]-ETHYL}-N,N-DIMETHYLCARBAMOYL-CYCLO-HEXYLAMIN ZUR BEHANDLUNG NEGATIVER SYMPTOME DER SCHIZOPHRENIE
Examination procedure03.12.2019Examination requested  [2020/21]
20.11.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
31.05.2021Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.10.2021Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.11.2021Observations by third parties
05.12.2023Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
05.02.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.04.2024Observations by third parties
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP13805597.5  / EP2925324
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
03.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
03.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
03.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
03.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
20.11.2020Renewal fee patent year 08
24.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 09
24.11.2022Renewal fee patent year 10
24.11.2023Renewal fee patent year 11
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XD]WO2008142462  (RICHTER GEDEON NYRT [HU], et al) [XD] 1,2 * claim 36 *;
 [X]WO2010126527  (FOREST LAB HOLDINGS LTD [US], et al) [X] 1,2* claim 30 *
by applicantWO2005012266
 WO2008142462
    - "British Association for Psychopharmacology", Journal of Psychopharmacology, pages 1 - 54
    - LENERT et al., Schizophrenia Research, (20040000), vol. 71, pages 155 - 165
    - KAY et al., Schizophr. Bull., (19870000), vol. 13, pages 261 - 76
otherWO2008139235
 WO2008142462
    - Lenert et al., "Public preferences for health states with schizophrenia and a mapping function to estimate utilities from positive and negative symptom scale scores", Schizophrenia Research, Netherlands , (20041101), vol. 71, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.schres.2003.10.010, ISSN 0920-9964, pages 155 - 165, XP004564917

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.schres.2003.10.010
    - Larry Alphs, "Asenapine in the Treatment ofNegative Symptoms of Schizophrenia:Clinical Trial Design and Rationale", Psychopharmacology Bulletin, (20070101), vol. 40, no. 2, pages 41 - 53, XP093157920
    - Durgam Suresh; Starace Anju; Li Dayong; Migliore Raffaele; Ruth Adam; Németh György; Laszlovszky István , "An evaluation of the safety and efficacy of cariprazine in patients with acute exacerbation of schizophrenia: A phase II, randomized clinical trial", Schizophrenia Research, Netherlands , (20140110), vol. 152, no. 2, doi:10.1016/j.schres.2013.11.041, ISSN 0920-9964, pages 450 - 457, XP028820701

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.schres.2013.11.041
    - Correll Christoph U, Schooler Nina R, "Negative Symptoms in Schizophrenia: A Review and Clinical Guide for Recognition, Assessment, and Treatment", Neuropsychiatric Disease and Treatment, (20201120), Volume 16, doi:10.2147/NDT.S225643, pages 519 - 534, XP093107006

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2147/NDT.S225643
    - Lenert, L.A. Sturley, A.P. Rapaport, M.H. Chavez, S. Mohr, P.E. Rupnow, M., "Public preferences for health states with schizophrenia and a mapping function to estimate utilities from positive and negative symptom scale scores", Schizophrenia Research, Netherlands , (20041101), vol. 71, no. 1, doi:10.1016/j.schres.2003.10.010, ISSN 0920-9964, pages 155 - 165, XP004564917

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.schres.2003.10.010
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.