EP3663975 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LEARNING PIXEL VISUAL CONTEXT FROM OBJECT CHARACTERISTICS TO GENERATE RICH SEMANTIC IMAGES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.03.2024 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The application has been published Status updated on 08.05.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.03.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AstraZeneca Computational Pathology GmbH Bernhard-Wicki-Str. 5 80636 München / DE | [2021/51] |
Former [2020/24] | For all designated states Definiens GmbH Bernhard-Wicki-Str. 5 80636 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PAULY, Olivier Hieronimusstr. 22 81241 München / DE | 02 /
BRIEU, Nicolas Auenstrasse 112 80649 München / DE | 03 /
SCHMIDT, Günter Behringstraße 93 80999 München / DE | 04 /
ZIMMERMANN, Johannes Forststraße 38 82069 Hohenschäftlarn / DE | 05 /
BINNIG, Gerd Villenstraße Süd 28 82288 Kottgeisering / DE | [2020/24] | Representative(s) | AstraZeneca Intellectual Property Eastbrook House Shaftesbury Road Cambridge CB2 8BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/24] | Winter, Brandl, Fürniss, Hübner, Röss, Kaiser, Polte - Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Alois-Steinecker-Strasse 22 85354 Freising / DE | Application number, filing date | 19213622.4 | 29.07.2015 | [2020/24] | Priority number, date | US201414473096 | 29.08.2014 Original published format: US201414473096 | [2020/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3663975 | Date: | 10.06.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/69, G06V10/25, G06V10/56, G06V10/764, G06V10/772, G06V10/46, G06F18/243 | [2024/16] | CPC: |
G06V20/695 (EP,US);
G06F18/24323 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06T7/162 (US);
G06V10/25 (EP,US);
G06V10/462 (EP,US);
G06V10/56 (EP,US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/772 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/24] | G06K9/00, G06K9/46, G06K9/32, // G06K9/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] |
Former [2020/24] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUM LERNEN VON VISUELLEM PIXELKONTEXT AUS OBJEKTEIGENSCHAFTEN ZUR ERZEUGUNG REICHER SEMANTISCHER BILDER | [2020/24] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LEARNING PIXEL VISUAL CONTEXT FROM OBJECT CHARACTERISTICS TO GENERATE RICH SEMANTIC IMAGES | [2020/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME D'APPRENTISSAGE DE CONTEXTE VISUEL DE PIXELS À PARTIR DES CARACTÉRISTIQUES D'UN OBJET POUR GÉNÉRER DES IMAGES SÉMANTIQUES RICHES | [2020/24] | Examination procedure | 19.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.11.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 19.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP15178864.3 / EP3023910 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.07.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 07.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2008008349 (BINNIG GERD [DE], et al) [A] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0007] - [0014] - [0 50] - [0051] - [0 56] - [0059] - [0 61] , [0 67] , [0 79] *; | [Y]US2014140610 (TU ZHUOWEN [CN], et al) [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [0013] - [0025] - [0 33] - [0039] *; | [Y] - GLOCKER BEN ET AL, "Joint Classification-Regression Forests for Spatially Structured Multi-object Segmentation", 12TH EUROPEAN CONFERENCE ON COMPUTER VISION, ECCV 2012; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE], PAGE(S) 870 - 881, (20121007), ISSN 0302-9743, ISBN 978-3-540-37783-2, XP047531221 [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * section 2 * * section 3 * * figures 1-2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/978-3-642-33765-9_62 | [A] - NILS WOLF, "Object Features for Pixel-based Classification of Urban Areas Comparing Different Machine Learning Algorithms", PHOTOGRAMMETRIE, FERNERKUNDUNG, GEOINFORMATION, (20130601), vol. 2013, no. 3, doi:10.1127/1432-8364/2013/0166, ISSN 1432-8364, pages 149 - 161, XP055690543 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 150, column right, paragraph 2 * * section 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1127/1432-8364/2013/0166 | [A] - HAVAEI MOHAMMAD ET AL, "Efficient Interactive Brain Tumor Segmentation as Within-Brain kNN Classification", INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON PATTERN RECOGNITION, IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY, US, (20140824), doi:10.1109/ICPR.2014.106, ISSN 1051-4651, pages 556 - 561, XP032698227 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 556, column right, paragraph 2 * * sections III-A and III-B * * page 560 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICPR.2014.106 | [A] - BHATTACHARYA A ET AL, "ViVo: Visual Vocabulary Construction for Mining Biomedical Images", FIFTH IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON DATA MINING, HOUSTON, TX, USA 27-30 NOV. 2005, PISCATAWAY, NJ, USA,IEEE, (20051127), doi:10.1109/ICDM.2005.151, ISBN 978-0-7695-2278-4, pages 50 - 57, XP010870428 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * page 1, last paragraph * * section 3 * * section 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICDM.2005.151 | [A] - K FUKUDA ET AL, "Data mining and image segmentation approaches for classifying defoliation in aerial forest imagery", IN PROCEEDINGS OF THE 3RD INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS ON ENVIRONMENTAL MODELLING AND SOFTWARE, BURLINGTON, VERMONT, USA, (20060709), XP055690541 [A] 1-4 * abstract * * section 3 * | [A] - DAVID LIU ET AL, "DISCOV: A Framework for Discovering Objects in Video", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MULTIMEDIA, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (20080201), vol. 10, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TMM.2007.911781, ISSN 1520-9210, pages 200 - 208, XP011200209 [A] 3 * section III.A, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMM.2007.911781 | by applicant | US8319793 |