blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3667306

EP3667306 - PROBE FOR MEASURING A PROPERTY OF A GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.01.2024
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  27.01.2023
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.09.2022
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  04.12.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  15.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip24.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): IT
published on 26.06.2024  [2024/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Renault s.a.s
122-122 bis avenue du Général Leclerc
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
[2022/30]
Former [2022/09]For all designated states
Renault s.a.s
13/15, quai Alphonse Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne Billancourt / FR
Former [2020/25]For all designated states
RENAULT s.a.s.
13-15 quai Le Gallo
92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR
Inventor(s)01 / BUNOT, Allan
Bis rue Jean Moulin
78730 Saint Arnoult en Yvelines / FR
02 / SAUVAN, Muriel
41 Hameau de la Pirogue Port Sud
91650 Breuillet / FR
 [2020/25]
Representative(s)Renault Group
Renault s.a.s.
1 avenue du Golf
FR TCR AVA 055
78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2023/09]Renault Group
Renault s.a.s.
API : TCR GRA 2 36
1, Avenue du Golf
78084 Guyancourt Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date19213713.105.12.2019
[2020/25]
Priority number, dateFR2018007271211.12.2018         Original published format: FR 1872712
[2020/25]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3667306
Date:17.06.2020
Language:FR
[2020/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3667306
Date:01.03.2023
Language:FR
[2023/09]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:G01N27/407
[2020/25]
CPC:
G01N27/4077 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/01]
Former [2020/25]AL,  AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  RS,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:SONDE ZUR MESSUNG EINER EIGENSCHAFT EINES GASES[2022/39]
English:PROBE FOR MEASURING A PROPERTY OF A GAS[2020/25]
French:SONDE DE MESURE D'UNE PROPRIÉTÉ D'UN GAZ[2020/25]
Former [2020/25]SONDE ZUR MESSUNG EINER EIGENSCHAFT EINES GASES
Examination procedure01.12.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.12.2020Examination requested  [2021/01]
01.12.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.09.2022Communication of intention to grant the patent
20.01.2023Fee for grant paid
20.01.2023Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.01.2023Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Opposition(s)04.12.2023No opposition filed within time limit [2024/06]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.12.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT01.03.2023
CZ01.03.2023
DK01.03.2023
EE01.03.2023
ES01.03.2023
FI01.03.2023
HR01.03.2023
IT01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
LV01.03.2023
NL01.03.2023
PL01.03.2023
RO01.03.2023
RS01.03.2023
SE01.03.2023
SI01.03.2023
SK01.03.2023
SM01.03.2023
NO01.06.2023
GR02.06.2023
IS01.07.2023
PT03.07.2023
[2024/26]
Former [2024/10]AT01.03.2023
CZ01.03.2023
DK01.03.2023
EE01.03.2023
ES01.03.2023
FI01.03.2023
HR01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
LV01.03.2023
NL01.03.2023
PL01.03.2023
RO01.03.2023
RS01.03.2023
SE01.03.2023
SI01.03.2023
SK01.03.2023
SM01.03.2023
NO01.06.2023
GR02.06.2023
IS01.07.2023
PT03.07.2023
Former [2023/50]AT01.03.2023
CZ01.03.2023
EE01.03.2023
ES01.03.2023
FI01.03.2023
HR01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
LV01.03.2023
NL01.03.2023
PL01.03.2023
RO01.03.2023
RS01.03.2023
SE01.03.2023
SK01.03.2023
SM01.03.2023
NO01.06.2023
GR02.06.2023
IS01.07.2023
PT03.07.2023
Former [2023/49]AT01.03.2023
CZ01.03.2023
EE01.03.2023
ES01.03.2023
FI01.03.2023
HR01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
LV01.03.2023
NL01.03.2023
PL01.03.2023
RO01.03.2023
RS01.03.2023
SE01.03.2023
SM01.03.2023
NO01.06.2023
GR02.06.2023
PT03.07.2023
Former [2023/48]AT01.03.2023
EE01.03.2023
ES01.03.2023
FI01.03.2023
HR01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
LV01.03.2023
NL01.03.2023
PL01.03.2023
RS01.03.2023
SE01.03.2023
SM01.03.2023
NO01.06.2023
GR02.06.2023
PT03.07.2023
Former [2023/46]ES01.03.2023
FI01.03.2023
HR01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
LV01.03.2023
NL01.03.2023
PL01.03.2023
RS01.03.2023
SE01.03.2023
SM01.03.2023
NO01.06.2023
GR02.06.2023
PT03.07.2023
Former [2023/38]ES01.03.2023
FI01.03.2023
HR01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
LV01.03.2023
NL01.03.2023
PL01.03.2023
RS01.03.2023
SE01.03.2023
NO01.06.2023
GR02.06.2023
Former [2023/37]ES01.03.2023
FI01.03.2023
HR01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
LV01.03.2023
RS01.03.2023
SE01.03.2023
NO01.06.2023
GR02.06.2023
Former [2023/36]ES01.03.2023
FI01.03.2023
HR01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
LV01.03.2023
RS01.03.2023
SE01.03.2023
NO01.06.2023
Former [2023/35]ES01.03.2023
HR01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
RS01.03.2023
NO01.06.2023
Former [2023/34]ES01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
RS01.03.2023
Former [2023/33]ES01.03.2023
LT01.03.2023
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3211533  (PROCESS ELECTRONIC ANALYSE UND [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 * * claim 4 ** page 4, paragraph 4 *;
 [XA]US9213014  (SEKIYA TAKAYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,12-14 * figures 2,10-13, 24,25,29 * * column 6, lines 47-49 * * column 18, lines 28-29 * [A] 3-11
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.