blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3671065

EP3671065 - COOLING DEVICE COMPRISING A PARAMAGNETIC GARNET CERAMIC [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  11.02.2022
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  22.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip30.12.2024New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Commissariat à l'Energie Atomique et aux Energies Alternatives
25 Rue Leblanc
Bat Le Ponant
75015 Paris / FR
[2024/44]
Former [2020/26]For all designated states
Commissariat à l'énergie atomique et aux énergies alternatives
Bâtiment le Ponant
25, rue Leblanc
75015 Paris / FR
Inventor(s)01 / DUVAL, Jean-Marc
c/o CEA GRENOBLE DRF/INAC
17 rue des Martyrs
38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR
02 / MARIN, Christophe
c/o CEA GRENOBLE DRF/INAC
17 rue des Martyrs
38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR
03 / PAIXAO BRASILIANO, Diego Augusto
c/o CEA GRENOBLE DRF/INAC
17 rue des Martyrs
38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR
04 / BICHAUD, Emmanuelle
c/o CEA GRENOBLE DRF/INAC
17 rue des Martyrs
38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR
05 / DURAND, Jean-Louis
c/o CEA GRENOBLE DRF/INAC
17 rue des Martyrs
38054 GRENOBLE CEDEX 09 / FR
 [2020/26]
Representative(s)Brevalex
Tour Trinity
1 B Place de la Défense
92400 Courbevoie / FR
[N/P]
Former [2020/26]Brevalex
95, rue d'Amsterdam
75378 Paris Cedex 8 / FR
Application number, filing date19216761.717.12.2019
[2020/26]
Priority number, dateFR2018007356520.12.2018         Original published format: FR 1873565
[2020/26]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3671065
Date:24.06.2020
Language:FR
[2020/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP29.04.2020
ClassificationIPC:F25B21/00
[2020/26]
CPC:
F25B21/00 (EP,US); H01F1/015 (US); C04B2235/764 (US);
F25B2321/002 (EP); F25B2321/0021 (US); F25B2321/0022 (US);
H10N15/20 (US); Y02B30/00 (EP) (-)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/26]
Extension statesBANot yet paid
MENot yet paid
Validation statesKHNot yet paid
MANot yet paid
MDNot yet paid
TNNot yet paid
TitleGerman:KÜHLVORRICHTUNG, DIE EINE PARAMAGNETISCHE GRANATKERAMIK UMFASST[2020/26]
English:COOLING DEVICE COMPRISING A PARAMAGNETIC GARNET CERAMIC[2020/26]
French:DISPOSITIF DE REFROIDISSEMENT COMPRENANT UNE CERAMIQUE DE GRENAT PARAMAGNETIQUE[2020/26]
Examination procedure17.12.2019Examination requested  [2020/26]
06.10.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.02.2022Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.06.2022Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2024Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.11.2024Reply to a communication from the examining division
Fees paidRenewal fee
30.11.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
21.12.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
30.12.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0081411  (COMMISSARIAT ENERGIE ATOMIQUE [FR]);
 [A]JPH02129097  (NAT RES INST METALS, et al);
 [XYI]ES2188322  (SOC ES CARBUROS METALICOS SA [ES]);
 [XYI]WO2009090442  (VACUUMSCHMELZE GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al);
 [Y]EP2762801  (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]);
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.