blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3653531

EP3653531 - INFUSION SET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  25.11.2022
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.12.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.09.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  31.08.2021
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  27.07.2021
FormerRequest for examination was made
Status updated on  27.11.2020
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  17.04.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip17.05.2024Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Becton, Dickinson and Company
1 Becton Drive, Mail Code 110
Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US
[2020/21]
Inventor(s)01 / LAWRENCE, Tyson
9 Seagrave Road
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US
02 / MCGEE, James
88 Gerrish Avenue, Apartment 206
Chelsea, MA 02150-2942 / US
03 / TAYLOR, Todd
1200 Massachusetts Avenue
48 West
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US
04 / COLONNA, Rob
16 Queensberry Street 5
Boston, Massachusetts 02215 / US
05 / SUGALSKI, Eric
128 Blossom Street
Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US
06 / LU, Zenas
50 Prince Street
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US
07 / BARMORE, Chris
70 Sunset Road
Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US
08 / BANIK, Robert
5206 City Place
Edgewater, NJ 07020 / US
09 / SKUTNIK, Peter
19 Payne Avenue
Midland Park, New Jersey 07432 / US
 [2020/28]
Former [2020/21]01 / LAWRENCE, Tyson
9 Seagrave Road
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02140 / US
02 / MCGEE, James
25 Hosmer Street, Apt 3
Watertown, Massachusetts 02472 / US
03 / TAYLOR, Todd
1200 Massachusetts Avenue
48 West
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US
04 / COLONNA, Rob
16 Queensberry Street 5
Boston, Massachusetts 02215 / US
05 / SUGALSKI, Eric
128 Blossom Street
Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US
06 / LU, Zenas
50 Prince Street
Cambridge, Massachusetts 02474 / US
07 / BARMORE, Chris
70 Sunset Road
Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US
08 / BANIK, Robert
9 West Maple Avenue
Long Valley, New Jersey 07853 / US
09 / SKUTNIK, Peter
19 Payne Avenue
Midland Park, New Jersey 07432 / US
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[2020/21]
Application number, filing date19217136.121.01.2010
[2020/21]
Priority number, dateUS20090202019P21.01.2009         Original published format: US 202019 P
[2020/21]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3653531
Date:20.05.2020
Language:EN
[2020/21]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP3653531
Date:19.01.2022
Language:EN
[2022/03]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.02.2020
ClassificationIPC:B65D81/02, B65B25/00, A61M5/158, A61M39/08, A61M5/00
[2020/21]
CPC:
A61M5/158 (EP,US); A61M39/08 (EP,US); A61M5/427 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1585 (EP,US); A61M2005/1586 (EP,US); A61M2005/1587 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1588 (EP,US); A61M2205/586 (EP,US); A61M2209/088 (EP,US);
A61M5/002 (EP,US); A61M5/14244 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2021/01]
Former [2020/21]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MK,  MT,  NL,  NO,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  SM,  TR 
TitleGerman:INFUSIONSSET[2020/21]
English:INFUSION SET[2020/21]
French:ENSEMBLE DE PERFUSION[2020/21]
Examination procedure20.11.2020Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
20.11.2020Examination requested  [2020/53]
20.11.2020Date on which the examining division has become responsible
28.07.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
31.08.2021Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
27.09.2021Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.2021Fee for grant paid
08.12.2021Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.12.2021Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP10733721.4  / EP2379424
Opposition(s)20.10.2022No opposition filed within time limit [2022/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
17.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
17.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 06
17.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 07
17.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 08
17.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 09
17.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 10
17.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 11
20.01.2021Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU21.01.2010
AT19.01.2022
CY19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
MK19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
IE21.01.2022
LU21.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
[2024/25]
Former [2024/23]AT19.01.2022
CY19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
MK19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
IE21.01.2022
LU21.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2024/20]AT19.01.2022
CY19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
IE21.01.2022
LU21.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2023/10]AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SI19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
IE21.01.2022
LU21.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2023/09]AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
IE21.01.2022
LU21.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2023/03]AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
LU21.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
CH31.01.2022
LI31.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2023/01]AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
LU21.01.2022
BE31.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/49]AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SK19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
LU21.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/48]AT19.01.2022
CZ19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
EE19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
LU21.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/47]AT19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
MC19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
RO19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
SM19.01.2022
LU21.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/46]AT19.01.2022
DK19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
LU21.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/42]AT19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
IS19.05.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/39]AT19.01.2022
FI19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/36]AT19.01.2022
HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
LV19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
PL19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
GR20.04.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/35]HR19.01.2022
LT19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
SE19.01.2022
BG19.04.2022
NO19.04.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/34]LT19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
NO19.04.2022
PT19.05.2022
Former [2022/33]LT19.01.2022
NL19.01.2022
NO19.04.2022
Former [2022/30]NL19.01.2022
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO2004101071  (MEDSOLVE TECHNOLOGIES L L C [US], et al) [X] 1 * page 9, lines 10-22; figures 2, 5 * [I] 7-12;
 [A]US2005107743  (FANGROW THOMAS F JR [US]) [A] 1-12* paragraph [0049]; figures 2-14 *;
 [XI]US2008243051  (DESTEFANO MARK A [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0103]; figures 1, 3, 23ff., 30 * [I] 7-12
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.