blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP3659905

EP3659905 - SPLICE ASSEMBLY FOR JOINING STRUCTURAL COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.06.2020
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
FormerThe application has been published
Status updated on  01.05.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.06.2020Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.07.2020  [2020/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[2020/23]
Inventor(s)01 / REEVES, Andrew C.
c/o The Boeing Company
100 North riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
 [2020/23]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[2020/23]
Application number, filing date19217714.525.11.2015
[2020/23]
Priority number, dateUS20141455781202.12.2014         Original published format: US201414557812
[2020/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP3659905
Date:03.06.2020
Language:EN
[2020/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.03.2020
ClassificationIPC:B64C1/06, // B64C1/12
[2020/23]
CPC:
B64C1/069 (EP,CN,US); B64C1/061 (EP,CN,US); B64C1/064 (EP,CN,US);
B64C1/12 (EP,US); Y10T29/49622 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAL,   AT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MK,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   RS,   SE,   SI,   SK,   SM,   TR [2020/23]
TitleGerman:SPLEISSANORDNUNG ZUM ZUSAMMENFÜGEN VON STRUKTURELLEN KOMPONENTEN[2020/23]
English:SPLICE ASSEMBLY FOR JOINING STRUCTURAL COMPONENTS[2020/23]
French:ENSEMBLE D'ÉPISSURE POUR L'ASSEMBLAGE DE COMPOSANTS STRUCTURAUX[2020/23]
Examination procedure02.06.2020Application withdrawn by applicant  [2020/28]
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP15196204.0  / EP3028940
EP18172583.9  / EP3388330
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 03
18.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.2019Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XA]GB641432  (SNCAN);
 [XA]GB821147  (ARTHUR FREDERICK JOHNSON);
 [XA]US4809480  (HALE CECIL E [US]);
 [A]US2008210819  (JARSAILLON GUILLAUME [FR], et al);
 [A]US2013181092  (CACCIAGUERRA BRUNO [FR], et al);
 [A]EP2727821  (BOEING CO [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.